EP4104994 - METHOD FOR SORTING FLEXIBLE POLYURETHANE FOAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Repsol, S.A. C/ Méndez Álvaro, 44 28045 Madrid / ES | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUBIO MORENO, Miguel 28935 MÓSTOLES / ES | 02 /
CARVAJAL GONZÁLEZ, Francisco Javier 28935 MÓSTOLES / ES | 03 /
SEGURA FERNÁNDEZ, Sonia 29835 MÓSTOLES / ES | 04 /
DOMÍNGUEZ RAMOS, Enrique 28935 MÓSTOLES / ES | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla de Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 21382541.7 | 18.06.2021 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4104994 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4104994 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/02, B29K75/00, B29K105/04, G01N21/3563, G01N21/359 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G01N21/3563 (EP,US);
B07C5/342 (US);
B29B17/02 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0203 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0279 (EP,US);
B29K2075/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/04 (EP,US);
B29K2105/065 (US);
G01N2201/127 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SORTIERUNG EINES FLEXIBLEN POLYURETHANSCHAUMSTOFFS | [2022/51] | English: | METHOD FOR SORTING FLEXIBLE POLYURETHANE FOAMS | [2022/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRI DE MOUSSES DE POLYURÉTHANE SOUPLES | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 25.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN110376157 (TIANJIN FIRE RES INSTITUTE OF MEM); |