EP4122467 - THX-B FOR TREATING AND PREVENTING CANCER AND METASTASIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fundación del Sector Público Estatal Centro Nacional de Investigaciones Oncológicas Carlos III (F.S.P. CNIO) Melchor Fernández Almagro, 3 28029 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Saragovi, Horacio Uri 3421 Marlowe Avenue Montréal, Québec H4A 3L8 / CA | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARAGOVI, Horacio Uri Montreal, Québec H4A3L8 / CA | 02 /
PEINADO SELGAS, Héctor 28029 Madrid / ES | 03 /
GARCÍA SILVA, Susana 28029 Madrid / ES | 04 /
NOGUÉS VERA, Laura 28029 Madrid / ES | 05 /
HERNÁNDEZ BARRANCO, Alberto 28029 Madrid / ES | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21382669.6 | 22.07.2021 | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4122467 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/522, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, A61P35/04, G01N33/50 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/522 (EP);
A61K39/39558 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
C07K16/2827 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/522, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THX-B ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND VORBEUGUNG VON KREBS UND METASTASEN | [2023/04] | English: | THX-B FOR TREATING AND PREVENTING CANCER AND METASTASIS | [2023/04] | French: | THX-B POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET LA PRÉVENTION DU CANCER ET DES MÉTASTASES | [2023/04] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2021 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 02.11.2021 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 26.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/01] | 16.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]WO2011041453 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [XD] 9-12 * example 1; claims 1-9,16 * [Y] 5,6; | [XI]WO2012048417 (SARAGOVI HORACIO URI [CA], et al) [X] 1-5,13 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5; compound (Ib) * * page 10, paragraph l * * page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 19; table 1; compounds I-B * * page 29, paragraph 2 * * page 30, paragraph 1; example -; claims 1,3,13,17 * * page 25, paragraph 2 - page 28, paragraph 1 * [I] 7,8; | [Y] - VIDAL ANNA ET AL, "Decoding the Role of CD271 in Melanoma", CANCERS, vol. 12, no. 9, doi:10.3390/cancers12092460, (20200831), page 2460, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC7564075/pdf/cancers-12-02460.pdf, XP055890310 [Y] 5,6 * whole document and more particularly page 12, point 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/cancers12092460 | [X] - BERETTI F ET AL, "CD271 is expressed in melanomas with more aggressive behaviour, with correlation of characteristic morphology by in vivo reflectance confocal microscopy", BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, JOHN WILEY, HOBOKEN, USA, (20150122), vol. 172, no. 3, doi:10.1111/BJD.13301, ISSN 0007-0963, pages 662 - 668, XP071158886 [X] 9-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/bjd.13301 | [X] - Guo Ruifeng ET AL, "Original Article Increased expression of melanoma stem cell marker CD271 in metastatic melanoma to the brain", Int J Clin Exp Pathol, (20140101), URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC4313973/pdf/ijcep0007-8947.pdf, (20220210), XP055890389 [X] 9-12 * the whole document * | [A] - María Platón-Corchado ET AL, "p75NTR antagonists attenuate photoreceptor cell loss in murine models of retinitis pigmentosa", Cell Death and Disease (2017), (20170713), URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/cddis2017306.pdf, (20220210), XP055890305 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [T] - GARCÍA-SILVA SUSANA ET AL, "Melanoma-derived small extracellular vesicles induce lymphangiogenesis and metastasis through an NGFR-dependent mechanism", NATURE CANCER, vol. 2, no. 12, doi:10.1038/s43018-021-00272-y, (20211201), pages 1387 - 1405, URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/s43018-021-00272-y.pdf, XP055890412 [T] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s43018-021-00272-y | by applicant | WO2011041453 | US9296691 | AU2019203598 | - VIDAL, A. et al., Cancers, (20200000), vol. 12, page 2460 | - ZHONG, M. et al., FEBS Open Bio, (20200000), vol. 2021, pages 226 - 236 |