EP4138283 - PERMANENT MAGNET MODULE FOR A PERMANENT MAGNET MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2023/31] |
Former [2023/08] | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy Innovation & Technology S.L. Avenida de la Innovación 9-11 31621 Sarriguren (Navarra) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMISSIE, Edom S10 1QD Sheffield / GB | 02 /
AZAR, Ziad S10 4ED Sheffield / GB | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/08] | SGRE-Association Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co KG Schlierseestraße 28 81539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21382771.0 | 20.08.2021 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4138283 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/03, H02K1/278, H02K1/2791, H02K1/02 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
H02K15/03 (EP,US);
H02K15/14 (US);
H02K1/02 (EP);
H02K1/2791 (EP);
H02K2213/03 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] |
Former [2023/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERMANENTMAGNETMODUL FÜR EINE PERMANENTMAGNETMASCHINE | [2023/08] | English: | PERMANENT MAGNET MODULE FOR A PERMANENT MAGNET MACHINE | [2023/08] | French: | MODULE D'AIMANT PERMANENT POUR MACHINE À AIMANT PERMANENT | [2023/08] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 28.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | 22.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor | 28.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JPH09121485 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1,4,7-10 * figures 1, 7, 8, 10 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * [A] 11,12 [I] 2,3,5,6; | [A]EP2555381 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figure 3 *; | [A]WO2014151496 (NORTHERN POWER SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * figures 2A, 2B, 3, 3A, 3B, 4A, 4B, 5A, 5B * * paragraph [0030] * * abstract *; | [A]EP3748813 (SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY AS [DK]) [A] 1-12* figures 2-4 * |