EP4154998 - METHOD AND LANDFILL FOR INERT WASTE STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martinez Martinez, José Urbanización Jardines Colgantes Calle Edelweiss Nr. 08 29602 Marbella / ES | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Hoffmann Eitle S.L.U. Paseo de la Castellana 140, 3a planta Edificio LIMA 28046 Madrid / ES | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21382871.8 | 28.09.2021 | [2023/13] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4154998 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, B09B1/00 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
B09B3/00 (EP);
B09B1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND DEPONIE ZUM LAGERN VON INERTEN ABFÄLLEN | [2023/13] | English: | METHOD AND LANDFILL FOR INERT WASTE STORAGE | [2023/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DÉCHARGE POUR LE STOCKAGE DE DÉCHETS INERTES | [2023/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/12] | 31.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0984835 (MESINGER JOSOHA [IL]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2388115 (ELCOCK RONALD STEPHEN [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2979905 (G R M S R L [IT]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 * |