EP4202801 - PREDICTIVE METHOD FOR ENERGY MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asociación BCAM-Basque Center for Applied Mathematics Alameda Mazarredo 14 48009 Bilbao (BIZKAIA) / ES | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZUELAS FRANCO, Santiago 48009 Bilbao / ES | 02 /
ÁLVAREZ CASTRO, Verónica 48009 Bilbao / ES | 03 /
LOZANO ALONSO, José Antonio 48009 Bilbao / ES | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Cueto, Sénida SP3 Patents S.L. Los Madroños, 23 28891 Velilla de San Antonio / ES | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21383216.5 | 24.12.2021 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202801 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N20/00 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G06N20/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRÄDIKTIVES VERFAHREN ZUR ENERGIEVERWALTUNG | [2023/26] | English: | PREDICTIVE METHOD FOR ENERGY MANAGEMENT | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PRÉDICTIF DE GESTION D'ÉNERGIE | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 20.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - YANG ZHE ET AL, "A Novel Concept Drift Detection Method for Incremental Learning in Nonstationary Environments", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS AND LEARNING SYSTEMS, IEEE, USA, vol. 31, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TNNLS.2019.2900956, ISSN 2162-237X, (20200101), pages 309 - 320, (20200103), XP011764410 [I] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNNLS.2019.2900956 | [I] - FEKRI MOHAMMAD NAVID ET AL, "Deep learning for load forecasting with smart meter data: Online Adaptive Recurrent Neural Network", APPLIED ENERGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, GB, vol. 282, doi:10.1016/J.APENERGY.2020.116177, ISSN 0306-2619, (20201110), (20201110), XP086388598 [I] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apenergy.2020.116177 | [A] - JOÃO GAMA ET AL, "A Survey on Concept Drift Adaptation", ACM COMPUTING SURVEYS., US, (20130131), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1145/2523813, ISSN 0360-0300, pages 1 - 44, XP055782959 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2523813 | [A] - SANTIAGO MAZUELAS ET AL, "Minimax Classification with 0-1 Loss and Performance Guarantees", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20201015), XP081953641 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [T] - VERONICA ALVAREZ ET AL, "Minimax Classification under Concept Drift with Multidimensional Adaptation and Performance Guarantees", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20220531), XP091236040 [T] * the whole document * | by applicant | US6577962 |