EP4187627 - A SINGLE-CELL PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE FOR IOT APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saule S.A. Dunska 11 54-427 Wroclaw / PL | [2024/10] |
Former [2023/22] | For all designated states Saule S.A. Postepu 14B 02-676 Warszawa / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Babu, Vivek Wroclaw / PL | 02 /
Teixera, Cristina Wroclaw / PL | 03 /
Forgacs, David Wroclaw / PL | 04 /
Kedzierski, Igor Wroclaw / PL | 05 /
Gervasio, Joao Wroclaw / PL | 06 /
Wojak, Adrian Wroclaw / PL | 07 /
Huzar, Mateusz Wroclaw / PL | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Kancelaria Eupatent.pl Sp. z.o.o Ul. Kilinskiego 185 90-348 Lodz / PL | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21461626.0 | 27.11.2021 | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187627 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/44, H01L27/30 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H10K30/81 (EP);
H10K39/10 (EP);
H10K85/50 (EP);
H10K30/40 (EP);
H10K30/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINZELLIGES PHOTOVOLTAISCHES MODUL FÜR IOT-ANWENDUNGEN | [2023/22] | English: | A SINGLE-CELL PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE FOR IOT APPLICATIONS | [2023/22] | French: | MODULE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE À CELLULE UNIQUE POUR DES APPLICATIONS D'IDO | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/19] | 02.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2020141252 (AALTO UNIV FOUNDATION SR [FI]); |