EP4086010 - HANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bulawa, Jerzy Mscislawska 8 m.5 01-647 Warszawa / PL | For all designated states Fabryka Opakowan Kosmetycznych "Pollena" Spolka Akcyjna Warszawska 77 08-450 Laskarzew / PL | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BULAWA, Jerzy 01-647 Warszawa / PL | 02 /
Zielinski, Konrad 55-003 Nadolice Wielkie / PL | 03 /
Ston, Artur 08-400 Garwolin / PL | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | AOMB Polska Sp. z.o.o. ul. Rondo Ignacego Daszynskiego 1 00-843 Warsaw / PL | [2024/20] |
Former [2022/45] | AOMB Polska Sp. z.o.o. Ul. Emilii Plater 53 21st Floor 00-701 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 21461635.1 | 14.12.2021 | [2022/45] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4086010 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4086010 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B05B13/02, B05C13/00, B23Q7/02, C25D17/06, C25D17/08, B05C13/02 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
B05B13/0235 (EP);
B05B13/02 (EP);
B05C13/02 (EP);
C25D17/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | B05C13/00, B23Q7/02, C25D17/06, B05B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] |
Former [2022/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HÄNGER | [2022/45] | English: | HANGER | [2022/45] | French: | CINTRE | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 28.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58135473U ; | [A]CN108588806 (GUANGDONG BAOYING ENVIRONMENTAL PROT ELECTROPLATING EQUIPMENT CO LTD) | by applicant | US2012321788 | DE102010047496 | TW201708589 |