EP3875893 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTACTLESS MEASUREMENT OF GEOMETRIC OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trifid Automation, s.r.o. Zochova 4 811 03 Bratislava / SK | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rusnák, Rudolf Strelenka 517 020 54 Lysá pod Makytou / CZ | 02 /
Kacmárik, Ján Hlavácikova 3163/27 841 05 Bratislava / CZ | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Plicka, Josef Cermák a spol. Elisky Peskove 15/735 150 00 Praha 5 / CZ | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 21466002.9 | 01.03.2021 | [2021/36] | Priority number, date | CZ20200000107 | 02.03.2020 Original published format: CZ 20200107 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/36] | CZ20200002010 | 02.03.2020 | Filing language | SK | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875893 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24, G01B11/245, G01M17/02, B29D30/06, B60C25/00, // G01B3/02 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
G01B11/2408 (EP);
B29D30/0633 (EP);
B60C25/007 (EP);
G01B11/2433 (EP);
G01B11/245 (EP);
G01M17/02 (EP);
B29D2030/0634 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BERÜHRUNGSLOSEN VERMESSUNG GEOMETRISCHER OBJEKTE | [2021/36] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTACTLESS MEASUREMENT OF GEOMETRIC OBJECTS | [2021/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE SANS CONTACT D'OBJETS GÉOMÉTRIQUES | [2021/36] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | 16.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5619587 (WILLOUGHBY JR LOUIS G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-11,13-15 * column 5, lines 11-21 * * column 7, lines 5-20; figure 1 * * column 9, lines 38-45 * * column 12, line 61 - column 15, line 23 *; | [X]US2013010175 (PICHON MICHEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,7,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0075] - [0097]; figures 1-4 *; | [XI]EP1824665 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [X] 1,7,9-11,13 * title * * paragraph [0033]; figure 1 * [I] 2-6,8,12,14,15; | [A]US2015160652 (HAIR JR CLARENCE VERNON [US], et al) [A] 6 * abstract ** paragraphs [0052] - [0063]; figures 1, 5 *; | [X]US2019271539 (BOFFA VINCENZO [IT], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,9-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0162] - [0173]; figures 4-10 * * paragraph [0221] * |