EP4087872 - EPITHELIAL CADHERIN-SPECIFIC ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kling Biotherapeutics B.V. Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam / NL | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEAUMONT, Tim c/o Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
MERAT, Sabrina Julia Louisa c/o Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
KWAKKENBOS, Mark Jeroen c/o Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam / NL | 04 /
KEDDE, Martijn c/o Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam / NL | 05 /
SPITS, Hergen c/o Meibergdreef 59 1105 BA Amsterdam / NL | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21700098.3 | 08.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021NL50009 | Priority number, date | EP20200151325 | 10.01.2020 Original published format: EP 20151325 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021141492 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087872 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
C07K16/2896 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K39/0011 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K47/6803 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/22 (KR);
C07K16/2809 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N5/0636 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
C07K2317/21 (EP,IL);
C07K2317/24 (KR);
C07K2317/31 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/34 (EP,IL);
C07K2317/41 (KR);
C07K2317/52 (EP,IL);
C07K2317/55 (KR);
C07K2317/77 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/92 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2510/00 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | EPITHELIALE CADHERIN-SPEZIFISCHE ANTIKÖRPER | [2022/46] | English: | EPITHELIAL CADHERIN-SPECIFIC ANTIBODIES | [2022/46] | French: | ANTICORPS SPÉCIFIQUES DE LA CADHÉRINE ÉPITHÉLIALE | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 21.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 07.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2634194 (PERSEUS PROTEOMICS INC [JP]); | [XI]US2015337048 (STULL ROBERT A [US], et al); | by applicant | US4681581 | US4735210 | US5101827 | US5102990 | US5648471 | US5697902 | WO2010087994 | WO2013081463 | WO2015093949 | US9534058 |