EP4087807 - A METHOD TO PREDICT A DETERIORATION IN A PASSENGER MOVING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TK Escalator Norte, S.A. Poligono Industrial la Pereda, s/n 33682 Mieres Asturias / ES | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANTELI ALVAREZ, Francisco Gloria Fuertes 28 33204 Gijón / ES | 02 /
MUSLERA FERNÁNDEZ, Ignacio Calle Torre Bermeja 8, 9B 33211 Gijón / ES | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/46] | Jacobi, Nicolas TK Elevator GmbH Abt. Legal, Compliance and Labor Relations (LCL) E-Plus-Straße 1 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 21700190.8 | 07.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021EP50191 | Priority number, date | EP20200382002 | 07.01.2020 Original published format: EP 20382002 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021140154 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4087807 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/00, B66B25/00 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
B66B5/0025 (EP,US);
B66B25/006 (EP,US);
B66B27/00 (US);
B66B5/0037 (EP);
G05B23/0221 (US);
B66B23/24 (US);
B66B3/002 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE EINER ABNUTZUNG IN EINEM FAHRGASTBEWEGUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/46] | English: | A METHOD TO PREDICT A DETERIORATION IN A PASSENGER MOVING SYSTEM | [2022/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRÉDIRE UNE DÉTÉRIORATION DANS UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT DE PASSAGER | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 02.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5092446 (SULLIVAN JR KENNETH J [US], et al) [X] 1,13,16-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 7 - column 9, line 33 * [I] 14; | [XI]US2016130114 (WILKE MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0030] * [I] 2,5-7; | [XI]US2017247226 (ROBERTS RANDALL KEITH [US]) [X] 1,3,4,8,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] - [0047] * [I] 2,5-7; | [XI]CN107304019 (KONE CORP) [X] 1,13,14,16-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0 21] - [0030] * [I] 15; | [XI]US2018029842 (LI JIANGUO [CN], et al) [X] 1,13,16-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0133] , [ 144] - [0156] *[I] 14; | [XI]US2018334363 (SAARELA SAMI [FI], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] - [0055] * [I] 2,5-7 | by applicant | US5785165 | EP3363758 |