EP4087417 - INDUCTIVELY-HEATED SUBSTRATE TABLET FOR AEROSOL DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLECKLEY, Karen H. 960 Kensal Green Drive Kernersville, North Carolina 27284 / US | 02 /
JACKSON, Thaddeus 7709 Briardenn Drive Summerfield, North Carolina 27358 / US | 03 /
JACKSON, Cortney Rasheen 8245 Ballard Road Colfax, North Carolina 27235 / US | 04 /
CONNER, Billy T. 180 Scott Farm Road Clemmons, North Carolina 27012 / US | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/46] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 21700235.1 | 07.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021IB50096 | Priority number, date | US202016737140 | 08.01.2020 Original published format: US202016737140 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021140463 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087417 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24D1/20, A24F40/42, A24F40/465, A24F40/20 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
A24D1/20 (EP,KR);
A24F40/40 (KR);
A61M15/06 (KR,US);
A24F40/42 (EP,KR);
A24F40/465 (EP,KR);
A24F40/50 (KR);
A61M11/042 (KR,US);
H05B6/105 (KR);
A24F40/20 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/3368 (KR,US);
A61M2205/3653 (KR,US);
A61M2205/8206 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | INDUKTIV BEHEIZTE SUBSTRATTABLETTE FÜR EINE AEROSOLABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/46] | English: | INDUCTIVELY-HEATED SUBSTRATE TABLET FOR AEROSOL DELIVERY DEVICE | [2022/46] | French: | COMPRIMÉ DE SUBSTRAT CHAUFFÉ PAR INDUCTION POUR DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION D'AÉROSOL | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 19.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO2017068093 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1,6-8,11,13,14 * page 10, line 11 - page page 12, line 25 page 26, line 30 - page 27, line 11 * [A] 2-5,9,10,15 [Y] 11; | [XY]WO2019105811 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1,6-8,10-14 * page 13, line 1 - page 15, line 7 *[Y] 10-12; | [XY]US2019200677 (CHONG ALEXANDER CHINHAK [US], et al) [X] 1-8,13-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0060] * [Y] 9-12; | [XAY]US2019387787 (HEJAZI VAHID [US]) [X] 1,6-9,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0006] , [0031] , [0048] - paragraphs [0066] , [0071] * [A] 2-5,15 [Y] 9-12 | by applicant | US3419015 | US4054145 | US4449541 | US4735217 | US4793365 | US4807809 | US4830028 | US4836224 | US4887619 | US4889143 | US4922901 | US4924887 | US4924888 | US4947874 | US4947875 | US5022416 | US5025814 | US5056537 | US5060671 | US5060676 | US5101839 | US5103842 | US5105831 | US5154192 | US5159942 | US5220930 | US5249586 | US5261424 | US5360023 | US5372148 | US5388594 | US5666977 | US5711320 | WO9857556 | US5934289 | US5954979 | US5967148 | US6040560 | US6053176 | US6164287 | US6196218 | US6204287 | WO0237990 | US6701936 | US6730832 | US6772756 | US6803545 | US6810883 | US2004255965 | US6854461 | US7011096 | US7017585 | US7025066 | US7040314 | US2006196518 | US7217320 | US2007215167 | US7290549 | US7293565 | US2008149118 | US7513253 | US2009095311 | US2009126745 | US2009188490 | US2009260641 | US2009260642 | US2009272379 | WO2010003480 | US7647932 | US2010024834 | US7726320 | WO2010091593 | US7832410 | US2010307518 | US7896006 | US8079371 | US2012042885 | US8156944 | US8186360 | US2012152265 | US8205622 | US2013008457 | US8375957 | US8402976 | WO2013089551 | US2013213417 | US2013255702 | US2014060554 | US8689804 | US2014096781 | US8794231 | US8851083 | WO2014182736 | US8910639 | US8915254 | US8925555 | US2015020823 | US2015020830 | US2015157052 | US9078473 | US2015220232 | US9107453 | US2015245659 | US2015245658 | US2015335070 | US2015344456 | US9220302 | US2016158782 | US9423152 | US2016262454 | US9484155 | US2017099877 | US2017112196 | US2017112191 | US2017202266 | US2018132531 | US2019124979 | US2019261685 | US2019289908 | - Fund. Appl. Toxicol., (19970000), vol. 39, pages 11 - 17 |