EP3887997 - OPTIMIZED DEVELOPMENT OF ELECTRO-MECHANICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2024 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | 07.10.2024 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mirmex Motor S.A. rue du Bosquet 15A 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUDART, François 12 Place de l'Amitité 1160 Bruxelles / BE | 02 /
BRUNO, Dehez 118 Route de Perwez 5310 Liernu / BE | 03 /
CEDRIC, Van Rossum 52 Avenue desMille Mètres 1150 Bruxelles / BE | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Calysta NV Lambroekstraat 5a 1831 Diegem / BE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 21700324.3 | 18.01.2021 | [2021/40] | WO2021EP50963 | Priority number, date | EP20200166943 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: EP 20166943 | US202016836707 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: US202016836707 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021148357 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3887997 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F30/20 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
G06F30/20 (EP,IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTE ENTWICKLUNG ELEKTROMECHANISCHER VORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/40] | English: | OPTIMIZED DEVELOPMENT OF ELECTRO-MECHANICAL DEVICES | [2021/40] | French: | DÉVELOPPEMENT OPTIMISÉ DE DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUES | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 30.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.06.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 04.08.2023 | Appeal received No. T1946/23 | 04.08.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 11.10.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.10.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI] - DEHEZ BRUNO ET AL, "Theoretical and Experimental Investigation of Flex-PCB Air-Gap Windings in Slotless BLDC Machines", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, (20140121), vol. 50, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TIA.2014.2301862, pages 3153 - 3160, XP011559152 [X] 16,17 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 3153, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3155, column 1, paragraph 4 * * page 3157, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3157, column 2, paragraph 5 * * page 3158, column 1, paragraph 5 * * page 3158, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3160, column 1, paragraph 2 * * figures 5,9 - 11 * * equation (29) * * tables II, III * * section III * [Y] 9 [I] 1-8,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIA.2014.2301862 | [YA] - FRANCOIS GUILLAUME ET AL, "Analytical Estimation of Eddy Current Losses in PCB Winding for the Optimal Sizing of PM Slotless Motor", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2019 IEEE INTERNATIONAL ELECTRIC MACHINES & DRIVES CONFERENCE, (20190512), doi:10.1109/IEMDC.2019.8785355, pages 862 - 869, XP033588727 [Y] 9 * the whole document * * abstract * * figure 9 * * table I * * equations (12), (33), (34) and (36) * * page 863, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 866, column 2, paragraph 1 * [A] 1-8,10-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMDC.2019.8785355 | [A] - DEHEZ BRUNO ET AL, "Analysis of a new topology of flexible PCB winding for slotless BLDC machines", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2014 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ELECTRICAL MACHINES, (20140902), doi:10.1109/ICELMACH.2014.6960453, pages 1963 - 1969, XP032687802 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * * abstract * * figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICELMACH.2014.6960453 | [A] - LIU YONG ET AL, "Design Considerations for MHz PCB Winding Magnetic Components", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2019 IEEE 4TH INTERNATIONAL FUTURE ENERGY ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, (20191125), doi:10.1109/IFEEC47410.2019.9015122, pages 1 - 8, XP033728014 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * * abstract * * figure 7 * * section III.E * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IFEEC47410.2019.9015122 | by applicant | EP0949749 | EP1590871 | WO2014207174 | EP3014744 | WO2016110549 | EP3297132 |