EP4087549 - ANTIMICROBIAL FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 30.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Medical Solutions Limited Premier Park 33 Road One Winsford Industrial Estate Winsford, Cheshire CW7 3RT / GB | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADFORD, Colin Raymond 7 South View Farnhill Keighley Yorkshire BD20 9AZ / GB | 02 /
PERKINS, Michael David 45 Sycamore Crescent Macclesfield Cheshire SK11 8LW / GB | 03 /
HARRISON, Benjamin Alexander 34 Mellorsfield Close Sandbach Cheshire CW11 1TT / GB | 04 /
BONNEFIN, Wayne Lee 30 Alexander Court Dee Lane Chester, CH3 5AW / GB | 05 /
BUGEDO ALBIZURI, Ander 40 The Fairways Winsford Cheshire CW7 2LF / GB | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Stafford, Jonathan Alan Lewis Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21700337.5 | 07.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021GB50037 | Priority number, date | GB20200000250 | 08.01.2020 Original published format: GB 202000250 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021140331 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087549 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61L15/28, A61K31/00 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
A61K9/7007 (EP);
A61L15/28 (EP,GB,US);
A61F13/00063 (GB);
A61K31/444 (EP);
A61K31/549 (EP);
A61K31/785 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61L15/44 (US);
A61L15/60 (GB);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61F2013/0091 (GB);
A61L2300/206 (EP,GB,US);
A61L2300/404 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/28, C08L1/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE FASERN | [2022/46] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL FIBRES | [2022/46] | French: | FIBRES ANTIMICROBIENNES | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 04.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE102006001954 (LOHMANN & RAUSCHER GMBH & CO [DE]); | [Y]WO2016115637 (FPINNOVATIONS [CA]); | [Y]WO2017085436 (ADV MED SOLUTIONS LTD [GB]); | by applicant | WO9416746 | EP0616650 | EP0783605 | CN102462860 | WO2017085436 |