EP4090530 - BIODEGRADABLE PACKAGING UNIT FOR A FOOD PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH PACKAGING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huhtamaki Molded Fiber Technology B.V. Poolsterweg 3 8938 AN Leeuwarden / NL | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUIPER, Harald John c/o Poolsterweg 3 8938 AN LEEUWARDEN / NL | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21700471.2 | 14.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021NL50018 | Priority number, date | NL20202024698 | 17.01.2020 Original published format: NL 2024698 | NL20202025241 | 30.03.2020 Original published format: NL 2025241 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021145764 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4090530 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/05, B32B7/06, B32B29/06, B65D81/34, B32B3/26, B65D65/46, B32B7/12, B32B27/08, B32B27/10, B32B27/30, B32B27/36 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
B32B27/36 (EP);
B65D65/466 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/10 (EP);
B32B27/306 (EP);
B32B29/06 (EP);
B32B3/266 (EP);
B32B7/05 (EP);
B32B7/06 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
B65D65/38 (EP);
B65D65/40 (EP,US);
B65D85/8043 (EP);
B32B2250/04 (EP);
B32B2250/40 (EP);
B32B2250/44 (EP);
B32B2260/028 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2262/062 (EP);
B32B2307/31 (EP);
B32B2307/41 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/414 (EP);
B32B2307/716 (EP);
B32B2307/7163 (EP);
B32B2307/7244 (EP);
B32B2307/7246 (EP);
B32B2307/7265 (EP);
B32B2307/734 (EP);
B32B2307/738 (EP);
B32B2307/748 (EP);
B32B2307/75 (EP);
B32B2439/40 (EP);
B32B2439/62 (EP);
B32B2439/70 (EP);
B65D2213/00 (US);
B65D2565/385 (EP);
B65D2565/386 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE VERPACKUNGSEINHEIT FÜR EIN NAHRUNGSMITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SOLCHEN VERPACKUNGSEINHEIT | [2022/47] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE PACKAGING UNIT FOR A FOOD PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH PACKAGING UNIT | [2022/47] | French: | UNITÉ D'EMBALLAGE BIODÉGRADABLE POUR PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LADITE UNITÉ D'EMBALLAGE | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 28.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2013071677 (PENTTINEN TAPANI [FI], et al) [Y] 1-4,6,19-21,23,24 * figure 9; paragraphs 2, 3, 5 *; | [X]US2017008694 (ANDREAE JAN [NL], et al) [X] 26,27* figures; paragraphs 1, 4, 7, 23, 37, 56, 58 *; | [X]US2017158422 (ANDREAE JAN [NL], et al) [X] 26,27 * figure 7; paragraphs 46-55 *; | [Y]WO2019190309 (HUHTAMAKI MOLDED FIBER TECH BV [NL]) [Y] 1-4,6,19-21,23,24 * page 2, lines 22-25, 33-34; page 3, lines 30-34; page 4, lines 16-24; claims 5, 6 *; | [XP]WO2020017968 (HUHTAMAKI MOLDED FIBER TECH BV [NL]) [XP] 1-5,13-16,19-21,23-25 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2010064899 |