EP4101261 - COOKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNANDEZ MARTINEZ, Manuel C/Juan Pablo Bonet 17-19, 4ºD 50006 Zaragoza / ES | 02 /
GARDE ARANDA, Ignacio Maurice Ravel, 31-5ºB 50012 Zaragoza / ES | 03 /
GRACIA CAMPOS, Oscar Calle Doctor Casas, 4, 3ºA 50008 Zaragoza / ES | 04 /
MURESAN, Paul Nuestra Señora del Pilar, nr. 22 50720 La Cartuja / ES | 05 /
PALACIOS TOMAS, Daniel Cesáreo Alierta nº 31, Esc.dcha, 6ºA 50008 Zaragoza / ES | 06 /
PUYAL PUENTE, Diego Valle de Zuriza, 25 - Esc.7, 6ºB 50014 Zaragoza / ES | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21700785.5 | 21.01.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021EP51278 | Priority number, date | EP20200382080 | 07.02.2020 Original published format: EP 20382080 | [2022/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021156065 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101261 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/06 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
H05B6/062 (EP);
H05B6/065 (US);
H05B2213/03 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | GARGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/50] | English: | COOKING DEVICE | [2022/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CUISSON | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 07.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2010069883 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 2; figure 3 *; | [X]WO2015092704 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11 * page 1, line 1 - line 2 * * page 7, line 27 - line 28; figure 1 * * page 8, line 22 - page 11, line 25; figure 2 *; | [X]EP3376826 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0001] ** paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014]; figure 1 * |