EP4100341 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTOMATED OPERATION OF A PLANT FOR STORING BULK MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koch Solutions GmbH Karl-Koch-Straße 1 66787 Wadgassen / DE | [2024/03] |
Former [2022/50] | For all designated states FLSmidth A/S Vigerslev Allé 77 2500 Valby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESSER, Philipp Werder Straße 28 50672 Köln / DE | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bernhardt / Wolff Partnerschaft mbB Europaallee 17 66113 Saarbrücken / DE | [2024/16] |
Former [2022/50] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 21701135.2 | 25.01.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021EP51556 | Priority number, date | DE202010201316 | 04.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020201316 | BE20200005066 | 04.02.2020 Original published format: BE 202005066 | [2022/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021156082 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4100341 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4100341 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04, B65G1/137 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
B65G1/0478 (EP);
B65G1/1371 (EP);
B65G2203/0208 (EP);
B65G2203/0233 (EP);
B65G2207/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | B65G3/02, B65G65/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM AUTOMATISIERTEN BETRIEB EINER ANLAGE ZUR LAGERUNG VON SCHÜTTGUT | [2022/50] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTOMATED OPERATION OF A PLANT FOR STORING BULK MATERIAL | [2022/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT AUTOMATISÉ D'UNE INSTALLATION DE STOCKAGE DE PRODUITS EN VRAC | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 05.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]CN104634815 (UNIV LIAONING TECHNICAL); | [YA]DE102015104229 (HAUK & SASKO INGENIEURGESELLSCHAFT MBH [DE]); | [IY]JP2017138166 (CHIYODA CORP); | by applicant | WO2009075945 | CN104634815 | DE102015104229 | JP2017138166 |