EP4093367 - ISOTROPIC CONCENTRATE AND WASH COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
Unilever IP Holdings B.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
DE
GB
IE
IT
MT
RS
TR
Unilever Global IP Limited Port Sunlight Wirral, Merseyside CH62 4ZD / GB | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIBAN, Douglas, John 40 Merritt Boulevard Trumbull, CT Connecticut 06611 / US | 02 /
VASUDEVAN, Tirucherai, Varahan 40 Merritt Boulevard Trumbull, CT Connecticut 06611 / US | 03 /
YE, Mingchang 40 Merritt Boulevard Trumbull, CT Connecticut 06611 / US | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Fijnvandraat, Arnoldus Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21701459.6 | 20.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021EP51124 | Priority number, date | US202062963937P | 21.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062963937 P | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021148428 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093367 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4093367 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61K8/42, A61K8/44, A61K8/46, A61K8/49, A61Q19/10, C11D1/12, C11D1/28, C11D1/94, C11D3/20, C11D17/00 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/466 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (EP);
A61K8/447 (EP);
A61K8/4993 (EP);
C11D1/126 (EP);
C11D1/28 (EP);
C11D1/94 (EP);
C11D17/0008 (EP);
C11D3/2065 (EP);
A61K2800/596 (EP);
C11D1/667 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOTROPES KONZENTRAT UND WASCHZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2022/48] | English: | ISOTROPIC CONCENTRATE AND WASH COMPOSITIONS | [2022/48] | French: | CONCENTRÉ ISOTROPE ET COMPOSITIONS DE LAVAGE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 31.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.01.2024
31.01.2024
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/10] | 16.02.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.06.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | MC | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5925603 (D ANGELO PAUL F [US]) [A] 1-9* examples 2, 7; claim 1; table 2 *; | [YA]US2017304173 (ELDER ALLISON [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraph [0146]; claims 1-10; table 1 * [A] 4-9; | [IAY]WO2019011521 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [I] 1-3 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * example 5; claim -; table 6 * [A] 4-9 [Y] 1-3 | by applicant | EP0133345 | WO9220776 | US5393466 | US5415810 | US5925603 | US6117828 | US2016000669 | - SUN et al., Journal of Cosmetic Science, (20030000), vol. 54, pages 559 - 568 | - KALIA et al., "Nanofibrillated cellulose: surface modification and potential applications", Colloidal Polymer Science, (20140000), vol. 292, doi:10.1007/s00396-013-3112-9, pages 5 - 31, XP035320488 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00396-013-3112-9 | Opposition | DE102007040909 | US2017304173 | DE102017216244 |