EP4090631 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCTION OF OZONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxi-Tech Solutions Limited Tremough Innovation Centre Penryn Cornwall TR10 9TA / GB | [2023/27] |
Former [2022/47] | For all designated states Barratt, Peter A 12 Red Lion Lane Overton Basingstoke RG25 3LH / GB | ||
For all designated states Oxi-Tech Solutions Limited Tremough Innovation Centre Penryn Cornwall TR10 9TA / GB | |||
For all designated states Fraser, Richard J Tremough Innovation Centre Penryn Campus Penryn TR10 9TA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRATT, Peter A 12 Red Lion Lane Overton Basingstoke RG25 3LH / GB | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Thurston, Joanna Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21702298.7 | 15.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021GB50096 | Priority number, date | deleted | [2023/19] |
Former [2022/47] | GB20200000499 | 14.01.2020 | |
GB20200000495 | 14.01.2020 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021144585 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4090631 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/78, C02F1/467, C25B9/70 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
C02F1/4672 (EP,GB,US);
C25B1/13 (EP,GB,US);
C25B1/04 (EP,GB);
C25B15/02 (EP,GB);
C25B9/15 (EP,GB,US);
C25B9/19 (EP,GB);
C25B9/70 (EP,GB);
C02F2201/46115 (EP,GB,US);
C02F2201/4616 (EP,GB);
C02F2201/782 (EP,GB,US);
C02F2209/006 (EP,GB);
C02F2209/23 (EP,GB,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OZON | [2022/47] | English: | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCTION OF OZONE | [2022/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION D'OZONE | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 08.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 06.09.2022 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5785866 (GEHRINGER PETER [AT], et al) [Y] 13-24 * column 5, lines 10-27; figure 1 *; | [A]US2002070123 (ANDREWS CRAIG C [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0086]; figure 2 *; | [XAI]US2012273367 (THEMY CONSTANTINOS DEAN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,10,25 * paragraphs [0038] - [0039] - [0052]; figure 2B * [A] 13-24 [I] 2,4-9,11,12,26; | [Y]WO2013109789 (ELECTROLYTIC OZONE INC [US]) [Y] 13-24* paragraphs [0002] , [0030] - [0031] - [0038] - [0039] - [0061] , [0074] , [0076] - [0077] - [0094]; figure 1A *; | [XAI]EP2837603 (LI YANBO [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,25 * paragraphs [0015] - [0019] - [0028]; figure 3 * [A] 13-24 [I] 3-8,11,12,26; | [XAI]US2016200573 (YOKOTA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5-8,25 * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] - [0013] - [0017] - [0023] , [0027]; figures 1,2 * [A] 13-24 [I] 2,4,9-12,26 | by applicant | WO2012156671 |