EP4104516 - IMPROVING CONDITIONAL HANDOVER OF MASTER NODE WITH SIMULTANEOUS CONDITONAL CELL CHANGE TO SECONDARY NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIERING, Ingo Kaspar-Spaet-Strasse 11 81549 Munich / DE | 02 /
STANCZAK, Jedrzej Maslicka 2A/10 54107 Wroclaw / PL | 03 /
HENTTONEN, Tero Joupinkuja 4 A 5 02760 Espoo / FI | 04 /
VIRTEJ, Elena Piispanpiha 1 A 21 02200 Espoo / FI | 05 /
KORDYBACH, Krzysztof ul. Ksieznej Izabelli 9/23 24-100 Pulawy / PL | 06 /
AWADA, Ahmad Fritz-Bauer-Strasse 13 81249 Munich / DE | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21702639.2 | 29.01.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021EP52050 | Priority number, date | US202062976251P | 13.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062976251 P | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021160441 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4104516 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/34 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
H04W36/34 (EP);
H04W36/00838 (EP,US);
H04W48/08 (US);
H04W36/0069 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER BEDINGTEN WEITERREICHUNG EINES HAUPTKNOTENS MIT GLEICHZEITIGEM BEDINGTEM ZELLWECHSEL ZUM SEKUNDÄREN KNOTEN | [2022/51] | English: | IMPROVING CONDITIONAL HANDOVER OF MASTER NODE WITH SIMULTANEOUS CONDITONAL CELL CHANGE TO SECONDARY NODE | [2022/51] | French: | AMÉLIORATION D'UN TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE CONDITIONNEL D'UN NOEUD MAÎTRE AVEC UN CHANGEMENT DE CELLULE CONDITIONNEL SIMULTANÉ VERS UN NOEUD SECONDAIRE | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 13.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018035339 (MITSUI KATSUHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2018332507 (FUJISHIRO MASATO [JP], et al); | [A]KR20200009089 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [AP]US2020120553 (WANG WEIWEI [CN], et al); | [XP]CN111901839 (ZTE CORP); |