EP4087898 - PHLOROGLUCINOLIC RESINS, METHODS OF MAKING, AND USES IN RUBBER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Advanced Technologies, LLC, D.B.A. Sumika Electronic Materials 3832 East Watkins Phoenix AZ 85034 / US | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITAHASHI, Tamon 1214 Fox Den Drive Cheswick, Pennsylvania 15024 / US | 02 /
NOBUOKA, Toshihiro 400 Maple Way Apartment F Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15238 / US | 03 /
WALKUP, C. Michael 107 Dinwiddie Drive New Kesington, Pennsylvania 15068 / US | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Michael Tetzner & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21703090.7 | 06.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021US12237 | Priority number, date | US202062958789P | 09.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062958789 P | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021141934 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087898 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L7/00, C08L21/00, C08G8/02, C08G8/20, C09J161/04, C09J161/12 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
C08L21/00 (EP,KR);
C08G8/20 (EP,KR);
C08L61/16 (KR,US);
C08G8/02 (EP,KR);
C08L7/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09J161/12 (EP,KR)
| C-Set: |
C08L21/00, C08L61/00 (EP);
C08L7/00, C08L61/16 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Extension states | BA | 13.06.2022 | ME | 13.06.2022 | Title | German: | PHLOROGLUCINOLHARZE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN IN KAUTSCHUKMISCHUNGEN | [2022/46] | English: | PHLOROGLUCINOLIC RESINS, METHODS OF MAKING, AND USES IN RUBBER COMPOSITIONS | [2022/46] | French: | RÉSINES PHLOROGLUCINOLIQUES, PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATIONS DANS DES COMPOSITIONS DE CAOUTCHOUC | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 13.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB590622 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC INT CO) [X] 1 * page 2, lines 107-109; claims 1,3 *; | [X]US2477641 (NAGEL FRITZ J) [X] 1 * example 8 *; | [A]US2011144234 (INUI NAOKI [JP]) [A] 1-17* example 1; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US2017153548 (NISHIMAKI HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0051] *; | [X]US2017174006 (MICHOUD CLÉMENT [FR], et al) [X] 1,16,17 * table 1 *; | [X]US2018009972 (DOISNEAU DAVID [FR], et al) [X] 1,16,17 * paragraph [0064]; table 1 *; | [X]US2019145493 (DOISNEAU DAVID [FR], et al) [X] 1,16,17 * paragraphs [0257] - [0259]; claims 50-58; table 1 *; | [X] - PIZZI ET AL, "Condensates of phenol, resorcinol, phloroglucinol, and pyrogallol as model compounds of flavonoid A- and B-rings with formaldehyde", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19790101), doi:10.1002/APP.1979.070240618, XP002792003 [X] 1 * page 1575; compounds VII,VIII * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.1979.070240618 | by applicant | US3751331 | US2014235125 | US2019119535 |