EP4100601 - CONTROL ARRANGEMENT FOR OPERATING A MOTOR VEHICLE LOCKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile SE & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft, Bamberg Berliner Ring 1 96052 Bamberg / DE | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEKENDAM, Rene Westen 19 42855 Remscheid / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Alexander Bergstraße 50 96120 Bischberg / DE | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Gottschald Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Klaus-Bungert-Straße 1 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21703202.8 | 02.02.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021EP52348 | Priority number, date | DE202010102775 | 04.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020102775 | [2022/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021156218 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4100601 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4100601 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E05B81/86 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
E05B81/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERANORDNUNG FÜR DEN BETRIEB EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGSCHLIESSSYSTEMS | [2023/38] | English: | CONTROL ARRANGEMENT FOR OPERATING A MOTOR VEHICLE LOCKING SYSTEM | [2022/50] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE COMMANDE DESTINÉ À FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2022/50] |
Former [2022/50] | STEUERANORDNUNG FÜR DEN BETRIEB EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGSCHLIEßSYSTEMS | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 05.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24158533.0 / EP4365394 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2818366 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]DE102014105873 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]); | [AD]US2015330116 (DENTE DAVIDE [IT]); | [A]US2016026205 (SONG MIN SUP [KR], et al) | by applicant | US2015330116 |