EP4096913 - FLOOR PANEL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING OF A FLOOR PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Champion Link International Corporation OMC Offices Babrow Building AI-2640 The Valley / AI | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN POYER, Tom No. 111 Chang Jiang Road Jiashan Development area Jiaxing, Zhejiang 314100 / CN | 02 /
BOON, Sven No. 111 Chang Jiang Road Jiashan Development area Jiaxing, Zhejiang 314100 / CN | 03 /
BAERT, Thomas Luc Martine Pijkenaas 1 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21703392.7 | 29.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021EP52218 | Priority number, date | NL20202024807 | 31.01.2020 Original published format: NL 2024807 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021152154 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096913 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/06, E04F15/10, C08L101/00 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
C08L101/005 (EP);
E04F15/02044 (CN);
E04F15/206 (CN);
E04F15/102 (EP);
E04F15/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | BODENPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER BODENPLATTE | [2022/49] | English: | FLOOR PANEL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING OF A FLOOR PANEL | [2022/49] | French: | PANNEAU DE PLANCHER ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PANNEAU DE PLANCHER | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 31.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2690142 (ARMSTRONG WORLD IND INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,27,29 *; | [A]WO2018234561 (CHAMPION LINK INT CORP, et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,35 *; | [A]WO2019064113 (FLOORING IND LTD SARL [LU]) [A] 1-14* claim 1 * |