EP4104243 - DUAL BAND FREQUENCY SELECTIVE RADIATOR ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451-1449 / US | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUSS, Jack J. 8 Cedar Street Newton, Massachusetts 02459-1112 / US | 02 /
THIESSEN, Phillip W. 333 Cartwright Road Wellesley, Massachusetts 02482-7128 / US | 03 /
SIKINA, Thomas V. 95 Main Street Acton, Massachusetts 01720-3541 / US | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 21704114.4 | 13.01.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021US13314 | Priority number, date | US202016786881 | 10.02.2020 Original published format: US202016786881 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021162818 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4104243 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/52, H01Q5/42, H01Q15/00, H01Q21/06, H01Q21/30 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
H01Q21/065 (EP,US);
H01Q5/40 (US);
G01S7/032 (US);
H01Q1/521 (EP);
H01Q15/0013 (EP,US);
H01Q21/062 (EP);
H01Q5/42 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | FREQUENZSELEKTIVE DUALBAND-STRAHLERANORDNUNG | [2022/51] | English: | DUAL BAND FREQUENCY SELECTIVE RADIATOR ARRAY | [2022/51] | French: | RÉSEAU DE RADIATEURS SÉLECTIFS EN FRÉQUENCE À DOUBLE BANDE | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 18.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2268335 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6 * page 5 - page 6; figure 2 *; | [XI]US6121931 (LEVI SHEM-TOV [IL]) [X] 1-4,11 * column 10 - column 12; figures 4-7 * [I] 9; | [A]US6452549 (LO ZANE [US]) [A] 9* column 5 - column 6; figures 2-4 *; | [XYI]US2006232479 (WALTON ERIC K [US]) [X] 1,5,11 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0025]; figures 2-5A * [Y] 6-8 [I] 9; | [Y]US2016365645 (BISIULES PETER J [US]) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027]; figure 2 * |