EP4093992 - PLANET CARRIER FOR A MECHANICAL REDUCTION GEAR OF AN AIRCRAFT TURBOMACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Transmission Systems 18 Boulevard Louis Seguin 92700 Colombes / FR | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, Adrien Louis Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
LAISNEZ, Frederic Nicolas François Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 03 /
MOULY, Guillaume Pierre Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21704852.9 | 11.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021FR50030 | Priority number, date | FR20200000583 | 21.01.2020 Original published format: FR 2000583 | [2022/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021148736 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093992 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/08 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
F16H57/082 (EP);
F02C7/36 (EP);
F05D2260/40311 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | PLANETENTRÄGER FÜR EIN MECHANISCHES UNTERSETZUNGSGETRIEBE EINER FLUGZEUGTURBOMASCHINE | [2022/48] | English: | PLANET CARRIER FOR A MECHANICAL REDUCTION GEAR OF AN AIRCRAFT TURBOMACHINE | [2022/48] | French: | PORTE-SATELLITES POUR UN REDUCTEUR MECANIQUE DE TURBOMACHINE D'AERONEF | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 05.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3939736 (MORIN JEAN); | [XI]JP2005351294 (NSK LTD); | [XI]JP2009030749 (NSK LTD); | [XI]JP4631323B | by applicant | JP2005351294 | JP2009030749 | WO2010092263 | JP4631323B | FR2987416 | FR3011901 | FR3041054 | FR3058493 |