EP4107297 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SURFACE-FINISHED STEEL SHEET, AND SURFACE-FINISHED STEEL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNGE, Fabian Ostendorfstraße 4 40239 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
SCHULZ, Jennifer Hermann-Osthoff-Straße 37 59427 Unna / DE | 03 /
CETINKAYA, Burak William Am Knappenberg 114 44139 Dortmund / DE | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Patente/Patent Department Kaiser-Wilhelm-Straße 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21705120.0 | 09.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021EP53004 | Priority number, date | DE202010202171 | 20.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020202171 | [2022/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021165088 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107297 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/52, C22C18/04, C23C2/06, C23C2/28, C23C2/12, C23C2/40 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
C23C2/06 (EP);
C23C2/28 (EP,US);
C21D9/52 (EP);
C22C18/04 (EP);
C23C2/12 (EP);
C23C2/261 (EP,US);
C23C2/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES OBERFLÄCHENVEREDELTEN STAHLBLECHS UND OBERFLÄCHENVEREDELTES STAHLBLECH | [2022/52] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SURFACE-FINISHED STEEL SHEET, AND SURFACE-FINISHED STEEL SHEET | [2022/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE TÔLE D'ACIER TRAITÉE EN SURFACE, ET TÔLE D'ACIER TRAITÉE EN SURFACE | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 21.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0905270 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8,11 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0120] * * No. 11, 15;; table 1 * * No. 2;; table 2 * * claims 1-21 * [I] 9,10,12; | [XI]JP2000336467 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [X] 1-4,6-8,11 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * tables 2-1 * * No 2A with No. 2-1 to 2-5;; tables 3, 4-1 * * claims 1-6 * [I] 5,9,10,12; | [XAI]EP3395465 (POSCO [KR]) [X] 1,3-8,11 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0058] * * Plating bath 1, 2, 4; Inventive Example 5;; tables 1-4 * * claims 1-19 * [A] 2,12 [I] 9,10; | [A] - KEPPERT T A ET AL, "The effect of magnesium on the corrosion of hot-dip galvanized steel in chloride containing environments", MATERIALS AND CORROSION, WILEY, vol. 65, no. 9, doi:10.1002/MACO.201307278, ISSN 0947-5117, (20140901), pages 871 - 880, (20140217), XP001592175 [A] 1-12 * Kapitel 2.1; page 872 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/maco.201307278 | by applicant | WO2013160871 | WO2015004284 |