EP4093574 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING ACCURACY IN LARGE AREA LASER PROCESSING USING POSITION FEEDFORWARD COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novanta Corporation 125 Middlesex Turnpike Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCAS, Mark 7 John Francis Lane Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US | 02 /
SIVAM, Seetharam 349 Walden Street Concord, MA 01742 / US | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21705383.4 | 22.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021US14632 | Priority number, date | US202062965491P | 24.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062965491 P | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021150904 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093574 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/03, B23K26/082, B23K26/08, B23K26/38, G05B19/19 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
B23K26/38 (EP,IL,KR);
B23K26/082 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G05B19/402 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B23K26/0344 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B23K26/0643 (IL,KR,US);
B23K26/083 (IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER GENAUIGKEIT IN EINER GROSSFLÄCHIGEN LASERBEARBEITUNG MITTELS POSITIONSVORWÄRTSKOPPLUNGSKOMPENSATION | [2022/48] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING ACCURACY IN LARGE AREA LASER PROCESSING USING POSITION FEEDFORWARD COMPENSATION | [2022/48] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR AMÉLIORER LA PRÉCISION DANS UN TRAITEMENT AU LASER DE GRANDE SURFACE À L'AIDE D'UNE COMPENSATION AMONT DE POSITION | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 18.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]US5751585 (CUTLER DONALD R [US], et al); | [XY]US2002198622 (DINAUER WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [XY]US2012095599 (PAK H ALI [US], et al); | [A]WO2015046926 (EO TECHNICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]US2018252936 (OWENS WINDSOR [US], et al) | by applicant | US5751585 | US2018056443 | US2018339364 |