EP4093719 - EFFICIENT PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING BIONUTRITIONAL COMPOSITIONS FOR PLANTS AND SOILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Envirokure Incorporated 5222 E. Comly Street Philadelphia, PA 19135 / US | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHALLA, Sushil K. 990 Integrity Drive Schwenksville, Pennsylvania 19473 / US | 02 /
HOOPER, Devon K. 16 Station Road Leesburg, New Jersey 08327 / US | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21705816.3 | 22.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021US14758 | Priority number, date | US202062965320P | 24.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062965320 P | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021150993 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093719 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C05F3/00, C05F17/20, C05F17/40 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
C05F3/00 (EP,IL);
C05F17/20 (EP,IL);
C05F17/40 (EP,IL);
Y02P20/145 (EP);
Y02W30/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIONÄHRSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR PFLANZEN UND BÖDEN | [2022/48] | English: | EFFICIENT PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING BIONUTRITIONAL COMPOSITIONS FOR PLANTS AND SOILS | [2022/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ EFFICACE POUR LA FABRICATION DE COMPOSITIONS BIONUTRITIONNELLES POUR PLANTES ET SOLS | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 02.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR100822378B (SAMOUL CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-48* claims 1-3 *; | [A]CN106007830 (JIANGSU INST POULTRY SCIENCES) [A] 1-48 * example 1 * * paragraphs [0036] - [0046] *; | [XDI]WO2017112605 (ENVIROKURE INCORPORATED [US], et al) [XD] 1-7,9,11-13,21-25,27-29,32,34-39 * figure 1; example 1; tables 3-6 * * page 15, line 15 - line 23 * * page 18, line 1 - line 13 * * page 26, line 28 - page 27, line 11 * * page 42, line 1 - page 45, line 29 * [I] 8,10,14-20,26,30,31,33,40-48 | by applicant | US9688584 | WO2017112605 | - WEISENBERGER, D.D., "Human Health Effects of Agrichemical Use", Hum. Pathol., (19930000), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 571 - 576 | - MULVANEY R.L. et al., J. Environ. Qual., (20090000), vol. 38, no. 6, pages 2295 - 2314 | - TOLLENAAR, M., Proceedings of the Conference on Physiology, Biochemistry and Chemistry Associated with Maximum Yield Corn, Foundation for Agronomic Research and Potash and Phosphate Institute, (19850000), pages 11 - 12 | - VALLAD, G.E.R.M. GOODMAN, Crop Sci, (20040000), vol. 44, pages 1920 - 1934 | - KATOVICH J. et al., "Weed Seed Survival in Livestock Systems", U. Minn. Extension Servs. & U. Wis. Extension, URL: https://www.extension.umn.edu/agriculture |