EP4096408 - METHOD FOR DISPERSING LIVING PREDATORY MITES OF THE GENUS PHYTOSEIULUS USED FOR BIOCONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/49] | METHOD FOR DISPERSING LIVE PREDATORY MITES OF THE PHYTOSEIULUS GENUS WHICH ARE USED IN BIOCONTROL | ||
[2023/25] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR, NO, PL, RS | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioline Agrosciences France 83 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75016 Paris / FR | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIGNET, Pascal 3, Impasse des Ferrages 06460 Saint Vallier de Thiey / FR | 02 /
BEN SOUSSAN, Tony 0190 B Route de Plascassier 06130 Grasse / FR | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21707000.2 | 29.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021FR50171 | Priority number, date | FR20200000988 | 31.01.2020 Original published format: FR 2000988 | [2022/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021152271 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096408 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4096408 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/16, A01N25/04, A01P7/02 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
A01N63/16 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N63/16, A01N25/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 03.08.2022 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DISPERGIEREN LEBENDER RAUBMILBEN DER GATTUNG PHYTOSEIULUS ZWECKS BIOKONTROLLE | [2023/25] | English: | METHOD FOR DISPERSING LIVING PREDATORY MITES OF THE GENUS PHYTOSEIULUS USED FOR BIOCONTROL | [2023/25] | French: | METHODE DE DISPERSION D'ACARIENS PREDATEURS VIVANTS DU GENRE PHYTOSEIULUS UTILISES EN LUTTE BIOLOGIQUE | [2023/25] |
Former [2022/49] | VERFAHREN ZUR DISPERSION VON LEBENDEN RAUBMILBEN DER GATTUNG PHYTOSEIULUS FÜR DIE BIOLOGISCHE SCHÄDLINGSBEKÄMPFUNG | ||
Former [2022/49] | METHOD FOR DISPERSING LIVE PREDATORY MITES OF THE PHYTOSEIULUS GENUS WHICH ARE USED IN BIOCONTROL | ||
Former [2022/49] | MÉTHODE DE DISPERSION D'ACARIENS PRÉDATEURS VIVANTS UTILISÉS EN LUTTE BIOLOGIQUE DU GENRE PHYTOSEIULUS | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 03.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2023 | Observations by third parties | 03.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2016023957 (INVIVO AGROSOLUTIONS [FR]); | other | WO9707898 |