EP4107292 - LOOP-MEDIATED ISOTHERMAL AMPLIFICATION PRIMERS FOR VIBRIO PARAHAEMOLYTICUS DETECTION AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neogen Food Safety US HoldCo Corporation 620 Lesher Place Lansing MI 48912 / US | [2023/46] |
Former [2023/44] | For all designated states Garden US Holdco Corporation 620 Lesher Place Lansing MI 48912 / US | ||
Former [2022/52] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONILLA, Tonya D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
PERCY, Neil 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
BARNES, Christina A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21707031.7 | 16.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021IB51293 | Priority number, date | US202062977586P | 17.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062977586 P | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021165828 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107292 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/689 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFENVERMITTELTE ISOTHERME AMPLIFIKATIONSPRIMER FÜR DIE DETEKTION VON VIBRIO PARAHAEMOLYTICUS UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2022/52] | English: | LOOP-MEDIATED ISOTHERMAL AMPLIFICATION PRIMERS FOR VIBRIO PARAHAEMOLYTICUS DETECTION AND USES THEREOF | [2022/52] | French: | AMORCES D'AMPLIFICATION ISOTHERMIQUE À MÉDIATION PAR BOUCLE POUR LA DÉTECTION DE VIBRIO PARAHAEMOLYTICUS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 09.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0177384 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO0244370 (KIM JIN WOO [KR]) [X] 1,18,20 * example 1 *; | [I]CN110684825 (UNIV NANKAI) [I] 1-22 * page 6; table 2 *; | [ ] - "Oligonucleotide primer SEQ ID NO 282465 for detecting SNP TSC0010797.", Geneseq, (20020222), Database accession no. ABH82472, URL: EBI, XP002802900 [ ] * sequence . * | [ ] - "Oligonucleotide primer SEQ ID NO 282282 for detecting SNP TSC0010617.", Geneseq, (20020222), Database accession no. ABH82289, URL: EBI, XP002802898 [ ] * sequence . * | [ ] - "Arbitrary 5' PCR primer used to amplify cDNA for differential display.", Geneseq, (20021007), Database accession no. ABK87930, URL: EBI, XP002802899 [ ] * sequence . * | [I] - SIDDIQUE M.P. ET AL, "groEL is a suitable genetic marker for detecting Vibrio parahaemolyticus by loop-mediated isothermal amplification assay", LETTERS IN APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, GB, vol. 65, no. 2, doi:10.1111/lam.12760, ISSN 0266-8254, (20170605), pages 106 - 113, URL: https://api.wiley.com/onlinelibrary/tdm/v1/articles/10.1111%2Flam.12760, XP055801350 [I] 1-22 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/lam.12760 | [I] - PROMPAMORN P. ET AL, "The development of loop-mediated isothermal amplification combined with lateral flow dipstick for detection of Vibrio parahaemolyticus : Detection of V. parahaemolyticus by LAMP-LFD", LETTERS IN APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, GB, (201104), vol. 52, no. 4, doi:10.1111/j.1472-765X.2011.03007.x, ISSN 0266-8254, pages 344 - 351, XP055801360 [I] 1-22 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1472-765X.2011.03007.x | [I] - KONGRUENG JETNAPHANG ET AL, "LAMP assay to detect Vibrio parahaemolyticus causing acute hepatopancreatic necrosis disease in shrimp", AQUACULTURE INTERNATIONAL, SPRINGER NETHERLANDS, NL, vol. 23, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S10499-014-9874-3, ISSN 0967-6120, (20150107), pages 1179 - 1188, (20150107), XP035543584 [I] 1-22 * abstract * * page 1180, paragraph last - page 1181 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10499-014-9874-3 | by applicant | WO0028082 | WO0134790 | WO0177317 |