EP4111204 - DPP3 FOR THERAPY GUIDANCE, MONITORING AND STRATIFICATION OF NT-ADM ANTIBODIES IN PATIENTS WITH SHOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4TEEN4 Pharmaceuticals GmbH Neuendorfstrasse 15A 16761 Hennigsdorf / DE | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGMANN, Andreas Am Rosenanger 78 13465 Berlin / DE | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Kilger, Ute Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21707707.2 | 26.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021EP54911 | Priority number, date | EP20200159848 | 27.02.2020 Original published format: EP 20159848 | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021170838 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4111204 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP);
C12Q1/37 (US);
G01N33/573 (US);
G01N2800/26 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US);
G01N2800/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | DPP3 ZUR THERAPIEFÜHRUNG, ÜBERWACHUNG UND STRATIFIZIERUNG VON NT-ADM-ANTIKÖRPERN BEI PATIENTEN MIT SCHOCK | [2023/01] | English: | DPP3 FOR THERAPY GUIDANCE, MONITORING AND STRATIFICATION OF NT-ADM ANTIBODIES IN PATIENTS WITH SHOCK | [2023/01] | French: | DPP3 POUR LE GUIDAGE, LA SURVEILLANCE ET LA STRATIFICATION THÉRAPEUTIQUE D'ANTICORPS NT-ADM CHEZ DES PATIENTS PRÉSENTANT UN CHOC | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 22.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2017182561 (SPHINGOTEC THERAPEUTICS GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-28 * Abstract; example 1; claims 26-41; p. 1, first paragraph; example 5, Fig. 2B; Fig. 10 *; | [Y]WO2019077082 (ADRENOMED AG [DE]) [Y] 1-28 * Abstract;pp. 8-10; claims; examples *; | [YD] - KOJI TAKAGI ET AL, "Circulating dipeptidyl peptidase 3 and alteration in haemodynamics in cardiogenic shock: results from the OptimaCC trial", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF HEART FAILURE, NL, (20190831), vol. 22, no. 2, doi:10.1002/ejhf.1600, ISSN 1388-9842, pages 279 - 286, XP055681198 [YD] 1-28 * Title; Abstract;p. 280, left hand column, paragraph 2, last sentence;p. 283, left hand column, paragraph 2;p. 285, left hand column, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejhf.1600 | [YD] - BENJAMIN DENIAU ET AL, "Circulating dipeptidyl peptidase 3 is a myocardial depressant factor: dipeptidyl peptidase 3 inhibition rapidly and sustainably improves haemodynamics", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF HEART FAILURE, NL, (20190831), vol. 22, no. 2, doi:10.1002/ejhf.1601, ISSN 1388-9842, pages 290 - 299, XP055681384 [YD] 1-28 * Title; Abstract;p. 291, left hand column, paragraph 1, last sentence;p. 298, left hand column, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejhf.1601 | [YD] - REHFELD LINDA ET AL, "Novel Methods for the Quantification of Dipeptidyl Peptidase 3 (DPP3) Concentration and Activity in Human Blood Samples", THE JOURNAL OF APPLIED LABORATORY MEDICINE: AN AACC PUBLICATION, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20190430), vol. 3, no. 6, doi:10.1373/JALM.2018.027995, ISSN 2475-7241, pages 943 - 953, XP009519664 [YD] 1-28 * Title; Abstract;p. 994, left hand column,paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/jalm.2018.027995 | [Y] - MAGLIOCCA AURORA ET AL, "Dipeptidyl peptidase 3, a biomarker in cardiogenic shock and hopefully much more", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF HEART FAILURE, NL, (20191215), vol. 22, no. 2, doi:10.1002/ejhf.1649, ISSN 1388-9842, pages 300 - 302, XP055806857 [Y] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejhf.1649 | [IP] - DENIAU BENJAMIN ET AL, "Inhibition of circulating dipeptidyl-peptidase 3 restores cardiac function in a sepsis-induced model in rats: A proof of concept study", PLOS ONE, (20200827), vol. 15, no. 8, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0238039, page e0238039, XP055806879 [IP] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0238039 | [IP] - FRANÇOIS DÉPRET ET AL, "Circulating dipeptidyl peptidase-3 at admission is associated with circulatory failure, acute kidney injury and death in severely ill burn patients", CRITICAL CARE, (20200422), vol. 24, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s13054-020-02888-5, XP055759383 [IP] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13054-020-02888-5 | [IP] - BLET A ET AL, "Monitoring circulating dipeptidyl peptidase 3 (DPP3) predicts improvement of organ failure and survival in sepsis: a prospective observational multinational study", CRITICAL CARE, UK, vol. 25, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s13054-021-03471-2, ISSN 1466-609X, (20210215), pages 1 - 10, URL: https://link.springer.com/content/pdf/10.1186/s13054-021-03471-2.pdf, XP055806855 [IP] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13054-021-03471-2 | by applicant | EP0353971 | WO9110741 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | WO9220791 | WO9312227 | EP0622458 | US5585089 | US5807715 | EP1266025 | US2004023334 | WO2004097423 | WO2005040229 | WO2006027147 | EP1941867 | US2010028995 | WO2010060748 | EP2231860 | WO2011023685 | EP2314308 | WO2011073214 | WO2011154420 | WO2013072510 | WO2013072511 | WO2013072512 | WO2013072513 | WO2013072514 | WO2017182561 | - DOSTAL et al., JMol Cell Cardiol, (19970000), vol. 29, pages 2893 - 902 | - ROKS et al., Heart Vessels, (19970000), pages 119 - 24 | - CORREA et al., Crit Care, (20150000), vol. 19, page 98 | - REHFELD et al., JALM, (20190000), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 943 - 953 | - DEANIAU et al., Eur J Heart Fail., (20200000), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 279 - 286 | - KITAMURA et al., Biochem Biovhvs Res Comm, (19930000), vol. 192, no. 2, pages 553 - 560 | - WAN.!? et al., Peptides, (20010000), vol. 22, pages 1835 - 1840 | - HINSON et al., Endocrine Reviews, (20000000), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 138 - 16 | - KITAMURA et al., Biochem Biovhvs Res Commun, (19980000), vol. 244, no. 2, pages 551 - 555 | - PIO et al., The Journal of Biological Chemistry, (20010000), vol. 276, no. 15, pages 12292 - 12300 | - KUWASAKI et al., FEBS Lett, (19970000), vol. 414, no. 1, pages 105 - 110 | - KUWASAKI et al., Ann. Clin. Biochem., (19990000), vol. 36, pages 622 - 628 | - TSURUDA et al., Life Sci., (20010000), vol. 69, no. 2, pages 239 - 245 | - HIRATA et al., Journal of Clinical Endocrinology and Metabolism, vol. 81, no. 4, pages 1449 - 1453 | - EHLENZ et al., Exp Clin Endocrinol Diabetes, (19970000), vol. 105, pages 156 - 162 | - VEDA et al., Am. J. Respir. Crit. Care Med., (19990000), vol. 160, pages 132 - 136 | - HIRAYAMA et al., JEndocrinol, (19990000), vol. 160, pages 297 - 303 | - YU et al., Heart, (20010000), vol. 86, pages 155 - 160 | - POVNER et al., Pharmacol Rev, (20020000), vol. 54, pages 233 - 246 | - LORENZ et al., Antimicrob Agents Chemother., (20110000), vol. 55, no. 1, pages 165 - 173 | - HULTSCHIS C et al., Curr Opin Chem Biol., (20060200), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 4 - 10 | - Kirk-Othmer, Encyclopedia of chemical technology, John Wiley & Sons, (19930000), vol. 15, pages 518 - 562 | - WEBER et al., JALM, (20170000), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 1 - 4 | - MARINO et al., Critical Care, (20140000), vol. 18, page R34 | - VINCENTDE BACKER, N. En l. J. Med., (20140000), vol. 370, no. 6, page 583 | - REVNOLDSHOCHMAN, Circulation, (20080000), vol. 117, page 686 69 7 | - HOCHMAN et al., J Am Coll Cardiol, (20000000), vol. 36, pages 1063 - 1070 | - GOLDBERG et al., Circulation, (20090000), vol. 119, pages 1211 - 1219 | - UDUPASHETTV, Indian JRespir Care, (20180000), vol. 7, pages 67 - 72 | - SINGER et al., JAMA, (20160000), vol. 315, no. 8, pages 801 - 10 | - WAGNER et al., Intensive Care Med Exp, (20130000), vol. 1, no. 1, page 21 | - GEVEN et al., Shock, (20180000), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 132 - 140 | - GEVEN et al., Intensive Care Med Exp, (20170000), vol. 5, no. 2, page 0427 | - LANZAVECCHIA et al., Eur. J. Immunol., (19870000), vol. 17, page 105 | - HUSTON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19880000), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - BIRD et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUNKAPILLERHOOD, Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - COULTERHARRIS, J. Immunol. Meth., (19830000), vol. 59, pages 199 - 203 | - ALMAGROFRANSSON, "Humanization of antibodies", Front Biosci., (20080101), vol. 13, pages 1619 - 33 | - LANE, R.D., J. Immunol. Meth., (19850000), vol. 81, pages 223 - 228 | - ZIEGLER et al., Horm. Metab. Res., (19960000), vol. 28, pages 11 - 15 | - MARX et al., Monoclonal Antibody Production, ATLA, (19970000), vol. 25, page 121 | - HUST et al., Journal of Biotechnology, (20110000), vol. 152, pages 159 - 170 | - SCHUTTE et al., PLoS One, (20090000), vol. 4, page e6625 | - LINDNER et al., Cancer Res., (20100000), vol. 70, pages 277 - 87 | - KAUFMANN et al., PNAS, (20100000), vol. 107, pages 14727 - 32 | - THOMAS et al., J. Exp. Med., (20090000), vol. 206, pages 1913 - 27 | - KONS et al., J. Cell Biol., (20090000), vol. 185, pages 1275 - 840 | - MARIANI et al., Mol. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 28, pages 489 - 498 | - BEALE, Exp Comp Immunol, (19870000), vol. 11, pages 287 - 96 | - ELLERSON et al., FEBS Letters, (19720000), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 318 - 22 | - KERBELELLIOT, Meth Enzvmol, (19830000), vol. 93, pages 113 - 147 | - KULKARNI et al., Cancer Immunol Immunotherapy, (19850000), vol. 19, pages 211 - 4 | - LAMOVI, Meth Enzymol, (19860000), vol. 121, pages 652 - 663 | - PARHAM et al., J Immunol Meth, (19820000), vol. 53, pages 133 - 73 | - RAVCHAUDHURI et al., Mol Immunol, (19850000), vol. 22, no. 9, pages 1009 - 19 | - ROUSSEAUX et al., Mol Immunol, (19800000), vol. 17, pages 469 - 82 | - ROUSSEAUX et al., J Immunol Meth, (19830000), vol. 64, pages 141 - 6 | - WILSON et al., J Immunol Meth, (19910000), vol. 138, pages 111 - 9 | - HARRISBAJORATH, Protein Sci., (19950000), vol. 4, pages 306 - 310 | - GEVEN et al., BMJ Open, (20190000), vol. 9, page e024475 | WO2005EP12844 |