EP4096622 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MICROBIAL TREATMENT OF SKIN DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFF US Holding, LLC 974 Centre Road Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAN, Amanda 616 WIGGINS MILL ROAD Townsend, Delaware 19734 / US | 02 /
FLANNERY, Helene 21 MEADOWLARK DRIVE SWEDESBORO, New Jersey 08085 / US | 03 /
GANNON, John Thomas 415 WILLOWBEND COURT Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | 04 /
HONG, Seung-Pyo 9 PIERSON'S RIDGE Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | 05 /
JACKSON, Raymond E 301 FASHION CIRCLE Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | 06 /
PETERSON, Jonathan David 105 DELAWARE AVENUE EGG HARBOR TWP, New Jersey 08234 / US | 07 /
YE, Rick W 177 ODYSSEY DRIVE Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21707842.7 | 29.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021US15670 | Priority number, date | US202062968228P | 31.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062968228 P | US202063116193P | 20.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063116193 P | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021155118 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096622 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/99, A61Q5/00, A61Q19/00 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
A61K8/99 (EP,KR);
A61K36/064 (US);
A61P31/10 (US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR);
A61Q5/00 (KR);
A61Q5/006 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MIKROBIELLEN BEHANDLUNG VON HAUTERKRANKUNGEN | [2022/49] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MICROBIAL TREATMENT OF SKIN DISORDERS | [2022/49] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT MICROBIEN DE TROUBLES CUTANÉS | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 24.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2010272839 (GUENICHE AUDREY [FR], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11,13-19,21-26 * paragraph [0002] * * claims 1,12 *; | [X]US2011243983 (PAUFIQUE JEAN [FR]) [X] 10,11 * claim 1 ** paragraphs [0153] , [0155] *; | [X]EP2405926 (OREAL [FR], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11,13-19,21-26 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0102] *; | [X]US2013129653 (CASTIEL ISABELLE [FR], et al) [X] 10,11 * paragraph [0001] * * claims 1,10,11 *; | [X]US2014127257 (SCHIEMANN YVONNE [DE], et al) [X] 10,11 * paragraph [0001] * * claim 11 *; | [XI]KR102005436B (UNIV KOOKMIN IND ACAD COOP FOUND [KR]) [X] 1-11,13-19,22-26 * claim 18 * * paragraph [0014] * [I] 12,20,27 | by applicant | US4855483 | WO0107009 | WO0212530 | - NAKATSUJI, T et al., "The Microbiome Extends to Subepidermal Compartments of Normal Skin", Nat. Commun., (20130000), page 4 | - SCHOMMER, N. N.GALLO, R. L., "Structure and Function of the Human Skin Microbiome", Trends Microbiol., (20130000), vol. 21, pages 660 - 668 | - HARDING, C. R et al., "Dandruff: a condition characterized by decreased levels of intercellular lipids in scalp stratum corneum and impaired barrier function", Arch. Dermatol. Res., (20020000), vol. 294, pages 221 - 230 | - Indian J. Dermatol, (20100400), vol. 55, no. 2, pages 130 - 134 | - CAS, no. 10237-77-1 | - MERBOUH et al., Carbohydr. Res., (20010000), vol. 336, pages 75 - 78 | - International Skin Care Ingredient Dictionary and Handbook, The Skin care, Toiletry, and Fragrance Assoc., (19970000), pages 1656 - 61,1626,1654-55 | - CLAVAUD et al., PLOS One, (20130000), vol. 8, page 10 | - AKAZA et al., J. Dermatology, (20140000), vol. 41, page 1069 | - XU, PNAS, (20070000), vol. 104, page 18730 | - BRANDWEIN et al., NPJ Biofilms Microbiomes, (20160000), vol. 2, page 3 | - KOO et al., Nature Reviews Microbiology, (20170000), vol. 15, pages 740 - 755 | - ANGIOLELLA et al., Med Mycol., (20200000), vol. 0, pages 1 - 7 | - FIGUEREDO et al., Medical Mycology, (20130000), vol. 8, pages 863 - 867 | - BUMROOGTHAI et al., Medical Mycology, (20160000), vol. 54, pages 544 - 549 | - ALLEN et al., J. of Clinical & Experimental Dermatology Research, (20150000), vol. 6, page 311 | - ANGIOLELLA et al., Medical Mycology, (20180000), vol. 56, pages 110 - 116 |