EP4107421 - ANALYSIS METHOD FOR GASES IN A COMPRESSED-GAS TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/52] | ANALYSIS DEVICE FOR GASES IN A COMPRESSED-GAS TANK | ||
[2023/50] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bauer Kompressoren GmbH Stäblistrasse 8 81477 München / DE | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Johannes Rothenbergstr. 21 86316 Friedberg / DE | 02 /
BURMEISTER, Thomas Tölzer Str. 20 83679 Sachsenkam / DE | 03 /
KAMPFL, Robert Murnauer Str. 205 81379 München / DE | 04 /
FRANTZ, Stefanie Drachenseestr. 7a 81373 München / DE | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2024/26] |
Former [2022/52] | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21708156.1 | 18.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021EP54032 | Priority number, date | DE20201001077 | 19.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020001077 | [2022/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021165399 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107421 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4107421 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/0009 (EP);
G01N33/0036 (KR);
G01N33/0063 (KR,US);
F17C13/02 (KR);
G01N33/0016 (KR);
G05D16/2066 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/52] | F17C5/06, F17C13/02, G01N33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALYSEVERFAHREN FÜR GASE IN EINEM DRUCKGASSPEICHER | [2023/50] | English: | ANALYSIS METHOD FOR GASES IN A COMPRESSED-GAS TANK | [2023/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE POUR DES GAZ DANS UN RÉSERVOIR DE GAZ COMPRIMÉ | [2023/50] |
Former [2022/52] | ANALYSEVORRICHTUNG FÜR GASE IN EINEM DRUCKGASSPEICHER | ||
Former [2022/52] | ANALYSIS DEVICE FOR GASES IN A COMPRESSED-GAS TANK | ||
Former [2022/52] | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE POUR DES GAZ DANS UN RÉSERVOIR DE GAZ COMPRIMÉ | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 18.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5810928 (HARADA HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]DE69837504T (CARLETON LIFE SUPPORT SYS INC [US]); | [A]CN207294167U (2ND PEOPLES HOSPITAL GUIYANG); | [A]US2019120431 (CARROLL MARVIN [US], et al) | by applicant | DE102018008636 |