EP4110113 - EMBEDDED ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International SA 8, rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUDA, Kentaro 2-2-1 Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | 02 /
LOVEDAY, Peter 20 Burghfield Epsom Surrey KT17 4ND / GB | 03 /
YAMADA, Manabu c/o Japan Tobacco Inc., 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 04 /
PIFA, Shen c/o Smoore Technology Ltd. Building C7 Xin'an 2nd Industry Park Gushu Village Xixiang Town Bao'an District / Shenzhen 518102 / CN | 05 /
CAO, Rui c/o Smoore Technology Ltd. No. 16, Dongcai Industry Park Gushu Village Xixiang Town Bao'an District / Shenzhen 518102 / CN | 06 /
TARORA, Masafumi c/o Japan Tobacco Inc., 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21708220.5 | 25.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021EP54768 | Priority number, date | WO2020CN77284 | 28.02.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/077284 | EP20200202410 | 16.10.2020 Original published format: EP 20202410 | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021170767 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4110113 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/42, A24F40/10, A24F40/40 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
A24F40/42 (EP,US);
A24F40/10 (EP,US);
A24F40/40 (EP);
A24F40/46 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | EINGEBETTETE ELEKTRODEN | [2023/01] | English: | EMBEDDED ELECTRODES | [2023/01] | French: | ÉLECTRODES NOYÉES | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 24.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2018077967 (HATTON NICHOLAS JAY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * paragraph [0076]; figures 10A-B * [I] 3-13; | [XI]CN209090053U (SHENZHEN IJOY TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,14,15 * abstract * [I] 3-13; | [XI]CN209768989U (SHENZHEN SMOORE CO LTD) [X] 1,2,15 * abstract *[I] 3-14; | [XI]WO2020030792 (JT INT SA [CH]) [X] 1-5,7-10,12,14,15 * page 6, line 29 - page 9, line 22; figures 2-4 * * page 1, line 15 - line 22 * [I] 6,11,13 |