EP4292155 - REDOX FLOW BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Green Energy Storage S.r.l. Via Sommarive, 18 Frazione Povo 38123 Trento (TN) / IT | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUCHER, Ilaria 38123 Trento (TN) / IT | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Palladino, Saverio Massimo, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 21708572.9 | 11.02.2021 | [2023/51] | WO2021EP53346 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022171284 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4292155 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04119, H01M8/04082, H01M8/18, H01M8/04186, H01M8/0662 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H01M8/188 (EP);
H01M8/04126 (EP);
H01M8/04201 (EP);
H01M8/04186 (EP);
H01M8/0662 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | REDOX-DURCHFLUSSBATTERIE | [2023/51] | English: | REDOX FLOW BATTERY | [2023/51] | French: | BATTERIE À FLUX REDOX | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 04.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 11.09.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.2023 | 29.02.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3152013 (WALTER JUDA) [A] 1-16 * the whole document ** column 1, lines 1-65; claims 1,2,7,9 *; | [Y]JPS61211960 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4818637 (MOLTER TRENT M [US], et al) [A] 1,9-13 * the whole document * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 25 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 35 *; | [XI]US2014072836 (MILLS RANDELL LEE [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * Paragraphs 8-13,76-80,163-181-197, 207,235,262,376,409-459,543 * [I] 9,10; | [Y]US2016141694 (SOLOVEICHIK GRIGORII LEV [US], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0026] - [0037] - [0039] *; | [A]US2016222524 (JOSHI ASHOK V [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0033] - [0068] - [0076] - [0100] - [0114] *; | [A]US2019341643 (REECE STEVEN Y [US], et al) [A] 1,9-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0037] - [0064] , [0081] *; | [X]US2020014048 (TOLMACHEV YURIY VYACHESLAVOVICH [US]) [X] 1-8,11-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0074] - [ 110] - [0115] - [0133] - [0164] - [0190] - [0197] - [0210] , [ 240] - [0248] - [0299] - [0324] *; | [I] - SCHLATTER A ET AL, "Evaluation of the performances of an hydrogen@?iodine fuel-cell", ENERGY CONVERSION,, vol. 14, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0013-7480(75)90080-7, ISSN 0013-7480, (19750201), pages 43 - 46, (19750201), XP023646557 [I] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0013-7480(75)90080-7 | [T] - TOLMACHEV YU. V., "Hydrogen-halogen electrochemical cells: A review of applications and technologies", RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF ELECTROCHEMISTRY, RU, vol. 50, no. 4, doi:10.1134/S1023193513120069, ISSN 1023-1935, (20140401), pages 301 - 316, URL: https://link.springer.com/content/pdf/10.1134/S1023193513120069.pdf, XP055855894 [T] 1-16 * abstract * * Pages: 303,304,308 * * Sections: 2.3.2-3.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S1023193513120069 |