EP4114867 - AQUEOUS RESIN COMPOSITION AND USE AS BINDER IN FIBRE-BASED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metadynea Austria GmbH Hafenstraße 77 3500 Krems / AT | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN HERWIJNEN, Hendrikus W. G. O.-Scharmitzerstrasse 47 3464 Hausleiten/Goldgeben / AT | 02 /
KANTNER, Wolfgang Bergweg 5a 3900 Schwarzenau / AT | 03 /
LUCIA, Arianna Semperstrasse 3/3 1180 Wien / AT | 04 /
ROSENAU, Thomas Paul-Ehrlich-Gasse 16/6 1190 Wien / AT | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21708707.1 | 05.03.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021EP55657 | Priority number, date | EP20200161303 | 05.03.2020 Original published format: EP 20161303 | [2023/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021176087 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4114867 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4114867 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08B15/00, C08B15/02 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
C08B15/005 (EP,US);
C08B15/02 (EP,US);
C08J5/043 (US);
C08K5/544 (US);
C08J2301/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG ALS BINDEMITTEL IN FASERBASIERTEN PRODUKTEN | [2023/02] | English: | AQUEOUS RESIN COMPOSITION AND USE AS BINDER IN FIBRE-BASED PRODUCTS | [2023/02] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE AQUEUSE ET SON UTILISATION EN TANT QUE LIANT DANS DES PRODUITS À BASE DE FIBRES | [2023/37] |
Former [2023/02] | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE AQUEUSE ET UTILISATION COMME LIANT DANS DES PRODUITS À BASE DE FIBRES | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 03.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 14.02.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [IAY]US2758111 (ROTH CURT B); | [YA]WO2009080696 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al); | [IAY]EP2615128 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]); | [IAY]CN106928375 (UNIV JIANGNAN) | by applicant | US2758111 | US3099573 | US3657066 | US3823233 | WO2009081264 | WO2009080696 | EP2615128 | CN106928375 |