EP4135931 - SHARPENING SHEATH ADAPTED TO RECEIVE A KNIFE, AND COMBINATION OF SUCH A SHEATH AND A KNIFE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. 112 Chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB 69130 Ecully / FR | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLICHON, Stéphane 671 route de l'abbaye 74350 ALLONZIER-LA-CAILLE / FR | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | SEB Développement Direction Propriété industrielle - Brevets 112, chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB - CS 90229 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 21709042.2 | 05.03.2021 | [2023/08] | WO2021EP55682 | Priority number, date | FR20200003709 | 14.04.2020 Original published format: FR 2003709 | [2023/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021209195 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4135931 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B24D15/08 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
B24D15/084 (EP,KR);
B24B3/54 (US);
B24D15/081 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Title | German: | SCHÄRFHÜLSE ZUR AUFNAHME EINES MESSERS UND KOMBINATION EINER SOLCHEN HÜLSE MIT EINEM MESSER | [2023/08] | English: | SHARPENING SHEATH ADAPTED TO RECEIVE A KNIFE, AND COMBINATION OF SUCH A SHEATH AND A KNIFE | [2023/08] | French: | FOURREAU AIGUISEUR ADAPTE A RECEVOIR UN COUTEAU ET COMBINAISON D'UN TEL FOURREAU ET D'UN COUTEAU | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 10.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2223140 (WILTSHIRE CUTLERY CO PTY [AU]) [A] 4 * figures 2,3,7 *; | [XI]FR2333614 (WILTSHIRE CUTLERY CO PTY [AU]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 7; figures 3,5,6,7,9-13 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 17 * [I] 4,5,11; | [A]EP0665086 (SEB SA [FR]) [A] 11* column 5, lines 11-56; figure 4 *; | [A]US5784786 (WILLIAMS DAVID MARK [GB]) [A] 5 * column 3, lines 55-59; figure 7 * | by applicant | FR2576537 |