EP4045756 - ARRANGEMENT FOR A PASSAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wanzl GmbH & Co. KGaA Rudolf-Wanzl-Straße 4 89340 Leipheim / DE | [2022/41] |
Former [2022/37] | For all designated states Wanzl GmbH & Co. KGaA Postfach 1129 89336 Leipheim / DE | ||
Former [2022/34] | For all designated states Wanzl GmbH & Co. KGaA Rudolf-Wanzl-Straße 4 89340 Leipheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄMMERLE, Jürgen Dürerstraße 26 89312 Günzburg / DE | 02 /
SOLTES, Tiberius Lorenz-Götz-Weg 10 89312 Günzburg / DE | 03 /
BAUMEISTER, Jörg Lettenberg 15a 86381 Krumbach / DE | 04 /
WEBERT, Dirk Amselweg 7 89340 Leipheim / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 21709621.3 | 07.01.2021 | [2022/34] | WO2021EP50197 | Priority number, date | DE202020100094U | 09.01.2020 Original published format: DE 202020100094 U | [2022/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021140158 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045756 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4045756 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E06B11/08, G01V8/20 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
E06B11/085 (EP,US);
G01V8/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG FÜR DURCHGANGSANLAGE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER ANORDNUNG | [2022/34] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR A PASSAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ARRANGEMENT | [2022/34] | French: | AGENCEMENT POUR UN SYSTÈME DE PASSAGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN AGENCEMENT | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 18.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0075806 (WANZL KG RUDOLF [DE]) [AD] 1,2,9,10,12 * figures 1, 5, 6 *; | [A]GB2175348 (WANZL KG RUDOLF) [A] 1,2* figure 1 *; | [I]EP2112322 (WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK KG [DE]) [I] 1-4,6-10,12-17 * figure 4 * | Examination | EP0075806 | DE8912021U | WO9001589 | US8928458 | by applicant | EP0075806 | EP0643189 | EP0622514 | DE102012106404 |