EP4114225 - METHOD FOR OPTIMISING INDIVIDUALLY MADE-TO-MEASURE ITEMS OF CLOTHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states eekual bionic GmbH Marienstraße 25 50825 Köln / DE | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYONS, William Marienstr. 25 50825 Köln / DE | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstraße 87 50968 Köln / DE | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21710263.1 | 04.03.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021EP55519 | Priority number, date | DE202010106181 | 06.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020106181 | DE202010111939 | 04.05.2020 Original published format: DE102020111939 | [2023/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021176018 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4114225 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4114225 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A43B1/00, A43B3/00, A43D1/02, A43D999/00, A41H1/00, A41H42/00 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
A43D1/025 (EP,US);
A41H1/00 (EP);
A41H1/02 (US);
A41H43/00 (EP);
A43B1/0027 (EP);
A43B3/34 (EP);
A43D1/00 (EP);
A43D999/00 (EP);
G05B15/02 (US);
A43D2200/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG VON INDIVIDUELL MASSGESCHNEIDERTEN KLEIDUNGSSTÜCKEN | [2023/02] | English: | METHOD FOR OPTIMISING INDIVIDUALLY MADE-TO-MEASURE ITEMS OF CLOTHING | [2023/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION D'ARTICLES VESTIMENTAIRES CONFECTIONNÉS SUR MESURE INDIVIDUELLEMENT | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 09.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2006131714 (CATTO CHRISTOPHER JOHN DIGNET [GB], et al) [Y] 8,9 * paragraph [0027] * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2009107009 (BISHOP ASHTON WALTER [AU], et al) [Y] 8,10 * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0113] *; | [Y]US2010324455 (RANGEL PAULO [US], et al) [Y] 7,17 * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0028] *; | [A]US2015351493 (ASHCROFT ROBERT L [GB], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0273] * * paragraph [0179] ** paragraph [0005] *; | [XYI]EP3199046 (ADIDAS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,12-15 * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0064] * [Y] 7-10,16-18 [I] 4,11; | [Y]US2017249783 (MACH SHEPHERD BATIA [IL], et al) [Y] 16,18 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0079] *; | [Y]WO2018085811 (CRANIN JONATHAN [US]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0010] * |