EP4103770 - PATCH PRODUCT BASED ON NATURAL POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bakel S.R.L. Viale del Ledra 56 33100 Udine / IT | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREGORIS, Raffaella Via Zorutti, 1 33100 Udine / IT | 02 /
MANFREDINI, Stefano Via Giovanni Pascoli, 4 44049 Vigarano Mainarda / IT | 03 /
VERTUANI, Silvia Via dei Calzolai, 64/C 44123 Ferrara / IT | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21710346.4 | 12.02.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021IB51196 | Priority number, date | IT20200002836 | 13.02.2020 Original published format: IT202000002836 | IT20210000113 | 05.01.2021 Original published format: IT202100000113 | [2022/51] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021161256 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4103770 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/00, A61K8/02, A61K8/73, A61Q19/00, B32B27/12, D01F1/10 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
D01D5/0007 (EP);
D01D5/003 (KR);
A61K9/7023 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/36 (US);
A61K8/0208 (EP,KR);
A61K8/65 (EP,KR);
A61K8/731 (EP,KR);
A61K8/732 (EP,KR);
A61K8/735 (EP,KR);
A61K8/737 (EP,KR);
B32B15/14 (EP,KR);
B32B15/20 (EP,KR);
B32B27/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,KR);
B32B5/022 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/24 (EP,KR);
B32B5/26 (EP,KR);
D01F1/10 (EP,KR);
B32B2250/40 (EP,KR);
B32B2255/02 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/02 (US);
B32B2262/06 (EP);
B32B2262/062 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/08 (EP,KR);
B32B2262/16 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | PFLASTERPRODUKT AUF DER BASIS NATÜRLICHER POLYMERE | [2022/51] | English: | PATCH PRODUCT BASED ON NATURAL POLYMERS | [2022/51] | French: | PRODUIT DE TYPE TIMBRE À BASE DE POLYMÈRES NATURELS | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 22.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR200418839Y (ADWIN KOREA CORPORATION) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0010]; figures 1-3c *; | [XA]GB2484319 (UNIV BOLTON [GB]) [X] 1,3-7,9 * page 5, lines 4-24 * [A] 2,8,10; | [XA]US2015272855 (KIM CHAN [KR]) [X] 1-7,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0007] , [0012] , [0013] , [0014] , [0018] , [0020] , [0031] , [0032] , [0077]; figure 1,; examples 1,2 * [A] 8,10; | [XA]US2017251789 (KIM CHAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0027] , [0028] , [0030] - [0032] - [0052] - [0056] - [0063] , [0065] , [0070] , [0071] , [0097] , [0098] , [0106] , [0107]; example 3, * [A] 8,10; | [A]CN109998932 (UNIV SUZHOU) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0014] , [0015] , [0018] , [0037] , [0038] , [0051]; figure 5; example 1 * |