EP4107469 - INSERTS HAVING BALLISTIC PROTECTION LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zephyros, Inc. 160 McLean Drive Romeo, MI 48065 / US | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SYNNESTVEDT, Blake 160 Mclean Drive Romeo, MI 48065 / US | 02 /
WALKER, Jason 160 Mclean Drive Romeo, MI 48065 / US | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21711118.6 | 17.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021US18300 | Priority number, date | US202062978879P | 20.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062978879 P | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021167933 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107469 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F41H5/013, F41H5/04, F41H7/04 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
F41H7/04 (EP,US);
F41H5/013 (EP,US);
F41H5/0471 (EP);
F41H5/0485 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | EINLAGEN MIT BALLISTISCHER SCHUTZSCHICHT | [2022/52] | English: | INSERTS HAVING BALLISTIC PROTECTION LAYER | [2022/52] | French: | INSERTS AYANT UNE COUCHE DE PROTECTION BALISTIQUE | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 20.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2009032585 (SUPRACOR INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 9; claim 7 *; | [XI]US2015059042 (AQUINO DOO KALMANSON [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0023] , [0077] , [0088] , [0089] , [0090] , [0093] , [0132]; figures 1-35; claims 1,14 * [I] 3; | [X]US2019353464 (NARDONE THOMAS MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1* paragraph [0020]; figures 1,4 * |