EP4118564 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE IN A DEPOT, TRAVEL CONTROL UNIT, AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Global GmbH Giacomettistrasse 1 3006 Bern / CH | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICKE, Janik An der Stauwiese 4 31311 Uetze / DE | 02 /
KLINGER, Tobias Glückaufstraße 11 31832 Springe / DE | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Rabe, Dirk-Heinrich ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 21711805.8 | 09.03.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021EP55831 | Priority number, date | DE202010106304 | 09.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020106304 | [2023/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021180671 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4118564 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/20, G06K9/32, G06K9/46 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
G06V20/653 (EP,US);
G05D1/0234 (US);
G05D1/0246 (US);
G06K7/1417 (US);
G06T7/593 (US);
G06V10/147 (EP,US);
G06V10/255 (EP,US);
G06V10/44 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINES FAHRZEUGES AUF EINEM BETRIEBSHOF, FAHRTSTEUEREINHEIT UND FAHRZEUG | [2023/03] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE IN A DEPOT, TRAVEL CONTROL UNIT, AND VEHICLE | [2023/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN VÉHICULE DANS UN DÉPÔT, UNITÉ DE COMMANDE DE DÉPLACEMENT ET VÉHICULE | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 10.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005281436 (GEHRING OTTMAR [DE], et al) [Y] 1-21 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0018] *; | [Y]EP2634070 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0019] *; | [Y]DE102018210340 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [Y] 1-21 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037] *; | [Y] - Tanner Stokes, "Garage door detection with OpenCV and Python", (20150213), page 1, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=fCRlvkibfxc, (20210604), XP054981867 [Y] 9 * 1:09-1:45 * | by applicant | DE102015105248 | WO2016164118 | DE102016116857 | DE102005009814 | US2018204072 |