EP4091316 - MASTER DATA PLACEMENT IN DISTRIBUTED STORAGE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, California 95134-1706 / US | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORNOW, Dominik, Rene 3371 Suncrest Avenue San Jose, California 95132 / US | 02 /
DAVE, Urmil, Vijay 920 Selby Ln. San Jose, California 95127 / US | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21712594.7 | 19.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021US14002 | Priority number, date | US202016741580 | 13.01.2020 Original published format: US202016741580 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021146725 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091316 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, G06F16/27 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
H04L67/1097 (EP,KR);
G06F3/067 (US);
G06F16/184 (EP);
G06F3/0604 (US);
G06F3/0644 (US);
G06F3/0647 (US);
H04L67/1021 (EP);
H04L67/1095 (EP,KR);
H04L67/289 (KR);
H04L67/568 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | MASTERDATENPLATZIERUNG IN VERTEILTEN SPEICHERSYSTEMEN | [2022/47] | English: | MASTER DATA PLACEMENT IN DISTRIBUTED STORAGE SYSTEMS | [2022/47] | French: | PLACEMENT DE DONNÉES MAÎTRE DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE STOCKAGE DISTRIBUÉS | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 05.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 13.09.2022 | Date of receipt | 05.10.2022 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2013246588 (BOROWICZ JAMES EDWARD [US], et al); | [A]US2014173229 (REOHR WILLIAM R [US], et al) |