EP4304888 - CURRENT COLLECTOR AND METHOD FOR OPERATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schunk Transit Systems GmbH Hauptstraße 97 35435 Wettenberg / DE | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFEFFER, Daniel 35325 Mücke / DE | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Georg-Schlosser-Straße 6 35390 Gießen / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 21712738.0 | 10.03.2021 | [2024/03] | WO2021EP56098 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022188972 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4304888 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60L5/38, B60L5/40 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
B60L5/38 (EP,GB,US);
B60L5/39 (GB);
B60L5/40 (EP);
H01R41/00 (GB);
B60L2200/26 (EP,GB,US);
B60L2240/36 (EP);
B60L2240/62 (EP);
B60L2240/662 (EP);
B60L2240/70 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | STROMABNEHMER UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB | [2024/03] | English: | CURRENT COLLECTOR AND METHOD FOR OPERATING | [2024/03] | French: | COLLECTEUR DE COURANT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 05.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]DE4438720 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [Y]JP2011205774 (RAILWAY TECHNICAL RES INST, et al); | [A]EP2838752 (SIEMENS AG OESTERREICH [AT]); | [YA]DE102017214418 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | by applicant | US2013081915 | DE102009054484 |