EP4121299 - FLAT SECURITY ELEMENT WITH OPTICAL SECURITY FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, ES, RO, SK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hueck Folien Gesellschaft m.b.H. Gewerbepark 30 4342 Baumgartenberg / AT | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRASSL, Stephan Bruderau 23a 4342 Baumgartenberg / AT | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | KLIMENT & HENHAPEL Patentanwälte OG Gonzagagasse 15/2 1010 Wien / AT | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21712759.6 | 15.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021EP56474 | Priority number, date | AT20200050225 | 16.03.2020 Original published format: AT 502252020 | [2023/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021185729 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4121299 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4121299 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/324 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
B42D25/324 (EP,AT,US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/36 (EP);
B42D25/364 (EP,US);
B42D25/378 (EP,US);
B42D25/29 (AT,US);
B42D25/373 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÄCHIGES SICHERHEITSELEMENT MIT OPTISCHEN SICHERHEITSMERKMALEN | [2023/04] | English: | FLAT SECURITY ELEMENT WITH OPTICAL SECURITY FEATURES | [2023/04] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE SÉCURITÉ PLAT PRÉSENTANT DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE SÉCURITÉ OPTIQUE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 13.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2023 | Observations by third parties | 20.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.04.2024
29.04.2024
ADMISSIBLE Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE Opponent's representative Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/23] | 15.05.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE102009056933 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,10-12 * figure 2 * [Y] 2-5,7-9; | [X]DE102011115589 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1* paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053]; figures 6,7 *; | [YD]DE102012015900 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [YD] 4,5 * figure 6 *; | [Y]EP3477346 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3,7-9 * figure 33 * | by applicant | EP1558449 | DE102012015900 | other | EP2453269 |