EP4121986 - ELECTRON-EMITTING CERAMIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states Technische Universität Dresden Mommsenstrasse 13 01069 Dresden / DE | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÄTZIG, Katja c/o. Fraunhofer-Institut für Keramische Technologien und Systeme IKTS 01277 Dresden / DE | 02 /
TAJMAR, Martin Hermann-Hesse-Straße 11 01324 Dresden / DE | 03 /
DROBNY, Christian Zur Tränke 3 04808 Wurzen / DE | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Rauschenbach, Marion Rauschenbach Patentanwälte Bienertstrasse 15 01187 Dresden / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21712815.6 | 17.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021EP56852 | Priority number, date | DE202010107795 | 20.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020107795 | [2023/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021185922 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4121986 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/16, H01B1/08, C01F7/16 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
H01B1/16 (EP);
C04B35/44 (EP,US);
C04B35/62665 (EP);
C04B41/51 (US);
C22C1/051 (EP);
C22C29/12 (EP);
H01B1/08 (EP);
B22F2998/10 (EP);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
C04B2235/3208 (EP);
C04B2235/3213 (EP);
C04B2235/3217 (EP);
C04B2235/3222 (US);
C04B2235/40 (EP);
C04B2235/404 (EP,US);
C04B2235/405 (EP);
C04B2235/407 (EP);
C04B2235/408 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP);
C04B2235/72 (EP);
C04B2235/76 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, C22C1/1084, B22F3/02, B22F3/10 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F2201/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONEN EMITTIERENDE KERAMIK | [2023/04] | English: | ELECTRON-EMITTING CERAMIC | [2023/04] | French: | CÉRAMIQUE À ÉMISSION ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 11.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2708521 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [XD]WO2014176603 (UNIV COLORADO STATE RES FOUND [US], et al); | [X]EP2865782 (TOKYO INST TECH [JP], et al); | [X]EP2865648 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [X]US2015184282 (ITO KAZUHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]EP3489197 (TOKYO INST TECH [JP], et al) | by applicant | US3515932 | EP0165164 | EP0200035 | WO2007060890 | WO2013191212 | WO2014176603 | US10002738 |