EP4128713 - ESTABLISHMENT OF A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Telecommunications public limited company 1 Braham Street London E1 8EE / GB | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORSTON-PETRIE, Andrew Ground Floor, Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | 02 /
BROWN, Ruth Ground Floor, Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | 03 /
HART, Jonathan Ground Floor, Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | British Telecommunications public limited company Intellectual Property Department 9th Floor One Braham Braham Street London E1 8EE / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21712839.6 | 19.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021EP57160 | Priority number, date | GB20200004406 | 26.03.2020 Original published format: GB 202004406 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021191091 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4128713 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L12/725, H04W40/24, H04L12/24 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
H04L45/306 (EP);
H04W40/24 (GB);
H04L67/63 (EP,US);
H04L41/342 (US);
H04L45/04 (GB,US);
H04L67/141 (GB,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | AUFBAU EINES TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSDIENSTES | [2023/06] | English: | ESTABLISHMENT OF A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SERVICE | [2023/06] | French: | ÉTABLISSEMENT D'UN SERVICE DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 30.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/19] | 12.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2017104847 (ZHANG QIONG [US], et al) [X] 1,16,20,25 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0103] * * figures 2-8 * [I] 2-15,17-19,21-24; | [A]WO2019120524 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-25 * page 3, line 2 - line 31 * * page 13, line 25 - page 15, line 10 * * page 24, line 18 - line 25 * * page 25, line 30 - page 266, line 26 *; | [A] - "5G End-to-End Architecture Framework", (20191110), 3GPP DRAFT; S6-192010, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/SA6/Docs/S6-192010.zip NGMN_E2EArchFramework_v3.0.8.docx, (20191110), XP051824217 [A] 1-25 * page 19, "5 Network Slicing" * * page 53, "10 ORCHESTRATION ARCHITECTURE FLAVOURS" - page 57, "11.2.4 Federated Network Slicing Service Model" * |