EP4115472 - MODULAR BATTERY SYSTEM FOR POWER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Toro Company 8111 Lyndale Avenue South Bloomington, MN 55420-1196 / US | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STROUD, Adam B. 8111 Lyndale Avenue South Bloomington, Minnesota 55420-1196 / US | 02 /
WADZINSKI, Chris A. 8111 Lyndale Avenue South Bloomington, Minnesota 55420-1196 / US | 03 /
BENJAMIN, Reid M. 8111 Lyndale Avenue South Bloomington, Minnesota 55420-1196 / US | 04 /
PETERSON, Tyler E. 8111 Lyndale Avenue South Bloomington, Minnesota 55420-1196 / US | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21713500.3 | 25.02.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021US19589 | Priority number, date | US202062983876P | 02.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062983876 P | [2023/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021178196 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4115472 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/258, H01M50/249, H01M50/284, H01M50/289, H01M50/291, H01M50/24, H01M50/256, H02J7/00, B60K1/04, B60L53/80, B60L58/22 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
H01M50/258 (EP,US);
B60L53/80 (US);
B60L58/12 (US);
B60L58/22 (US);
H01M10/425 (US);
H01M10/4257 (EP);
H01M10/441 (US);
H01M10/482 (US);
H01M10/486 (US);
H01M50/209 (US);
H01M50/213 (US);
H01M50/22 (US);
H01M50/24 (EP);
H01M50/249 (EP);
H01M50/256 (EP,US);
H01M50/264 (US);
H01M50/284 (EP,US);
H01M50/289 (EP);
H01M50/291 (EP,US);
H02J13/00016 (EP);
H02J7/00036 (EP);
H02J7/0013 (EP,US);
H02J7/0014 (EP);
H02J7/0048 (EP);
H02J7/0063 (EP);
A01D2101/00 (US);
A01D34/67 (US);
A01D34/78 (US);
B60K1/04 (EP);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
H02J2310/48 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | MODULARES BATTERIESYSTEM FÜR EIN ANTRIEBSAGGREGAT | [2023/02] | English: | MODULAR BATTERY SYSTEM FOR POWER EQUIPMENT | [2023/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE MODULAIRE DESTINÉ À UN ÉQUIPEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 28.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003211382 (AOYAMA TSUTOMU [JP]) [X] 1,3,6 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0057] *; | [I]WO2008106641 (JOHNSON CONTROLS SAFT ADVANCED [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0040]; figures 3-5, 8, 9 *; | [A]KR20110057590 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]EP2583858 (LINEAR TECHN INC [US]) [X] 27-29 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0074] *; | [I]WO2014145756 (DESIGN FLUX TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [I] 22-26 * page 11, line 5 - line 22 * * page 15, line 18 - line 28 * * page 21, line 21 - page 23, line 4 * * page 25, line 17 - line 22 * * page 40, line 21 - page 41, line 19 ** page 47, line 4 - line 5 *; | [XYI]CN204481067U (CORUN SHANGHAI AUTOMOTIVE POWER BATTERY SYSTEMS CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4,6 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 15 [I] 2,7-10; | [XYI]WO2018031719 (BRIGGS & STRATTON CORP [US]) [X] 11-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0081] * * figures 9-11 * [Y] 15 [I] 16; | [A]WO2019213407 (BRIGGS & STRATTON CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 2-5, 15-17 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * |