EP4118243 - SWEETENER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, Minnesota 55391 / US | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEXANDRE, Ben Cargill R&D Centre Europe BVBA Havenstraat 84 1800 Vilvoorde / BE | 02 /
BENSOUISSI, Abdelfattah Cargill R&D Centre Europe BVBA Havenstraat 84 1800 Vilvoorde / BE | 03 /
VAES, Nick Cargill R&D Centre Europe BVBA Havenstraat 84 1800 Vilvoorde / BE | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/03] | Jantschy, Jasmin Cargill R&D Centre Europe BVBA Bedrijvenlaan 9 2800 Mechelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 21713867.6 | 09.03.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021US21570 | Priority number, date | EP20200161793 | 09.03.2020 Original published format: EP 20161793 | [2023/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021183561 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4118243 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C13B30/02, C13B40/00, C13B50/00, A23L27/30, A23L29/30, A23L33/125, A21D13/062 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
C13B30/02 (EP);
A23L27/33 (US);
A21D13/062 (EP);
A23L27/30 (EP);
A23L29/30 (EP,US);
A23L33/125 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | SÜSSSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/03] | English: | SWEETENER COMPOSITION | [2023/03] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ÉDULCORANT | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 05.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3642535 (GRAHAM CHARLES P, et al) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 20 - column 6, line 17; claims 1,2 * * column 1, lines 4-54 *; | [X]EP0052919 (AMSTAR CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 5, line 5 - page 8, line 14; examples 10,11; claims 1,2,6,11 *; | [XI]US5876506 (CHERUKURI SUBRAMAN R [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-15 * column 14, line 60 - column 15, lines 2,31-41; examples 1,11; claims 1,6,9,19,23,24 *[I] 9; | [XI]US2002011181 (CUNNINGHAM MARY LOU [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0017] - [0029] , [0034]; examples 1-8; claims 1,2,20-22 * [I] 7,9 | by applicant | WO2011091962 | WO2017093302 | WO2017093309 | WO2017167965 | WO2018100059 | WO2018224546 | WO2018224539 | WO2018224534 | WO2018224537 | WO2018224542 | WO2018224541 | WO2018232078 |