EP4125876 - NEW THERAPEUTIC TARGETS WITH AN ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AND ANTI-INTERFERON EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 12.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université Paris Cité 85 Boulevard Saint-Germain 75006 Paris / FR | For all designated states Centre national de la recherche scientifique 3 rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERBEUVAL, Jean-Philippe 16 rue Gaston de Cavaillet 75015 PARIS / FR | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Benoit 9 rue du Clos Joli 92160 ANTONY / FR | 03 /
BEKKADOUR, Nassima 2 rue Montesquieu 47200 MARMANDE / FR | 04 /
BAUDOUIN, Vincent 64 avenue de Fontainebleau 94270 LE KREMLIN BICÊTRE / FR | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Vial, Lionel Cabinet Lionel Vial 6 rue de Vaugondran 91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Fidal Innovation 4-6 avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Application number, filing date | 21713991.4 | 26.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021EP58039 | Priority number, date | FR20200003087 | 27.03.2020 Original published format: FR 2003087 | [2023/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021191455 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4125876 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/404, A61K31/4412, A61K31/4439, A61K31/506, A61K45/06, A61K9/00, A61P29/00, A61P31/04, A61P31/12, A61P37/00, A61P43/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/551 (EP,US);
A61K31/404 (US);
A61K31/4409 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (US);
A61K31/506 (US);
A61P19/02 (US);
A61P19/06 (US);
A61P29/00 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4409, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/551, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | NEUE THERAPEUTISCHE ZIELMOLEKÜLE MIT ANTI-INFLAMMATORISCHER UND ANTI-INTERFERON-WIRKUNG | [2023/06] | English: | NEW THERAPEUTIC TARGETS WITH AN ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AND ANTI-INTERFERON EFFECT | [2023/06] | French: | NOUVELLES CIBLES THÉRAPEUTIQUES À EFFET ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRE ET ANTI-INTERFÉRON | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 19.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2019018603 (FATE THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al); |