EP4127124 - USE OF BY-PRODUCTS FROM THE ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE MANUFACTURING INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mialgae Ltd Dentons UK & Middle East LLP Quartermile One 15 Lauriston Place Edinburgh EH3 9EP / GB | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Douglas c/o MIALGAE LTD Dentons UK & Middle East LLP Quartermile One 15 Lauriston Place Edinburgh EH3 9EP / GB | 02 /
RAMANANTHAN, Shreekanth c/o MIALGAE LTD Dentons UK & Middle East LLP Quartermile One 15 Lauriston Place Edinburgh EH3 9EP / GB | 03 /
PIETRZYK, Julian C/O MIALGAE LTD Dentons UK & Middle East LLP Quartermile One 15 Lauriston Place Edinburgh EH3 9EP / GB | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Hindles Limited Clarence House 131-135 George Street Edinburgh, EH2 4JS / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21714371.8 | 23.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021GB50706 | Priority number, date | GB20200004205 | 23.03.2020 Original published format: GB 202004205 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021191596 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4127124 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12F3/08, C12F3/10 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
C12F3/10 (EP,US);
C12F3/08 (US);
A23V2250/1868 (EP);
A23V2250/187 (EP);
Y02P60/87 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON NEBENPRODUKTEN DER ALKOHOLISCHEN GETRÄNKEHERSTELLUNGSINDUSTRIE | [2023/06] | English: | USE OF BY-PRODUCTS FROM THE ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE MANUFACTURING INDUSTRY | [2023/06] | French: | UTILISATION DE SOUS-PRODUITS ISSUS DE L'INDUSTRIE DE FABRICATION DE BOISSONS ALCOOLISÉES | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 18.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]CN104256086 (QINGDAO INST BIOENERGY & BIOPROCESS TECHNOLOGY CAS); | [X]CN108893501 (QINGDAO INST BIOENERGY & BIOPROCESS TECH CAS); | by applicant | WO2012001416 |